|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/10/1927 | 11/11/1927 | 21 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6620 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/05/1930 | 08/07/1930 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 1325 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/02/1933 | 13/04/1933 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 1057 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/06/1935 | 27/07/1935 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 1959 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/05/1937 | 05/06/1937 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 1013 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/04/1939 | 27/05/1939 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 1377 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1941 | 10/05/1941 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 3355 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/05/1943 | 22/05/1943 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 1940 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/12/1944 | 11/01/1945 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 933 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/09/1946 | 09/11/1946 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 3321 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/04/1949 | 07/05/1949 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 1136 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63859 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/01/1951 | 03/02/1951 | 27 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 03/04/1951 | 05/05/1951 | 33 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22185 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/05/1952 | 08/05/1952 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 13/09/1952 | 04/10/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22104 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1953 | 31/10/1953 | 40 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 03/11/1953 | 06/11/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 09/08/1955 | 24/09/1955 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 22115 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/01/1956 | 23/03/1956 | 65 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 19/04/1958 | 21/06/1958 | 64 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 15/09/1960 | 17/10/1960 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 22142 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2065 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22156 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
22/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1927. Dep: 11/11/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6620 |
||
11/11/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
11/11/1927 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
25/11/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
23/02/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
12/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1930. Dep: 08/07/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1325 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/02/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1933. Dep: 13/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1057 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1935. Dep: 27/07/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1959 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1937. Dep: 05/06/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1013 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1939. Dep: 27/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1377 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1941. Dep: 10/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3355 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1943. Dep: 22/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1940 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1944. Dep: 11/01/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 933 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3859 | ||
09/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1946. Dep: 09/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3321 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1949. Dep: 07/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1136 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63859 |
||
16/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
25/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
17/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
08/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 08/01/1951. Dep: 03/02/1951. | ||
03/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 03/04/1951. Dep: 05/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22185 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/05/1952. Dep: 08/05/1952. | ||
13/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1952. Dep: 04/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22104 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/09/1953. Dep: 31/10/1953. | ||
03/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/11/1953. Dep: 06/11/1953. | ||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
09/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1955. Dep: 24/09/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22115 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/01/1956. Dep: 23/03/1956. | ||
19/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 19/04/1958. Dep: 21/06/1958. | ||
15/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1960. Dep: 17/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22142 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/10/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63859 from Colwick (40E) |