Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 3 Today
» 929 Yesterday
» 1840 Week
» 12985 Month
» 112770 Year
» 1778146 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 2066 m/e 07/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6621   24/09/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3860   26/05/1946
British Railways 63860 w/e 22/04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/307/1919
O4/7 (2-8-0)09/03/1940
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22157
To Service During 07/1919
Taken into Stock 29/09/1927
Withdrawal Thu 05/10/1961 off Colwick (40E)
Service Life 42 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1919
IMM   Immingham on 29/09/1927
91W   To Western Region / GWR (on loan) on 25/11/1940
WFD   Woodford Halse on 20/07/1942
SHF   Sheffield Darnall on 03/02/1946
40B   Immingham on 16/09/1956
40E   Colwick on 10/04/1960
     Withdrawn on 05/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall m/e 28/02/1946
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 16/04/1960
WDN   on 05/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1207)
21/05/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1866)
01/06/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1417)
02/10/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1852)
09/03/1940 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3662)
31/07/1943 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3676)
28/07/1945 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3668)
22/11/1947 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3669)
22/04/1950 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3679)
08/11/1952 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22304)
06/08/1955 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22871)
10/05/1958 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22317)
26/06/1959 Water Treatment apparatus fitted


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 25/06/1927 24/09/1927 92 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6621
 
Gorton Works 12/10/1929 16/11/1929 36 days General    
Gorton Works 14/05/1932 21/05/1932 8 days General Boiler number 1866 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/05/1935 01/06/1935 8 days General Boiler number 1417 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/09/1937 02/10/1937 15 days General Boiler number 1852 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1940 09/03/1940 29 days General Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3662 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1942 15/08/1942 4 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 08/07/1943 31/07/1943 24 days General Boiler number 3676 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1945 28/07/1945 29 days General Boiler number 3668 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 01/11/1947 22/11/1947 22 days General Boiler number 3669 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 01/04/1950 22/04/1950 22 days General Boiler number 3679 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63860
 
Gorton Works 01/11/1952 08/11/1952 8 days General Boiler number 22304 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1955 06/08/1955 43 days General Boiler number 22871 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1958 10/05/1958 36 days General Boiler number 22317 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 30/05/1958 08/06/1958 10 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 11/06/1959 26/06/1959 16 days Unclassified Water Treatment apparatus fitted
 
Gorton Works 30/09/1961 30/09/1961 1 day No repairs    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2066
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22157
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
25/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1927. Dep: 24/09/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6621
   
29/09/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
29/09/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
12/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1929. Dep: 16/11/1929.    
14/05/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1932. Dep: 21/05/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1866 (Diagram 15)
   
25/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1935. Dep: 01/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1417 (Diagram 15)
   
18/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1852 (Diagram 15)
   
10/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1940. Dep: 09/03/1940.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3662 (Diagram 15D)
   
25/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
20/07/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
12/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/08/1942. Dep: 15/08/1942.    
08/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1943. Dep: 31/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3676 (Diagram 15D)
   
30/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1945. Dep: 28/07/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3668 (Diagram 15D)
   
03/02/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
26/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3860    
01/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1947. Dep: 22/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3669 (Diagram 15D)
   
01/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1950. Dep: 22/04/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3679 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63860
   
01/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1952. Dep: 08/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22304 (Diagram 15D)
   
25/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1955. Dep: 06/08/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22871 (Diagram 15D)
   
16/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
05/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1958. Dep: 10/05/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22317 (Diagram 15D)
   
30/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/05/1958. Dep: 08/06/1958.    
11/06/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1959. Dep: 26/06/1959.
Work undertaken:
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
   
10/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
30/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 30/09/1961. Dep: 30/09/1961.    
05/10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 63860 from Colwick (40E)    

prev prev