|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 25/06/1927 | 24/09/1927 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6621 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/10/1929 | 16/11/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1932 | 21/05/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1866 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/05/1935 | 01/06/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1417 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/09/1937 | 02/10/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1852 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1940 | 09/03/1940 | 29 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3662 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/08/1942 | 15/08/1942 | 4 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 08/07/1943 | 31/07/1943 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 3676 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1945 | 28/07/1945 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3668 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/11/1947 | 22/11/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3669 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/04/1950 | 22/04/1950 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3679 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63860 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/11/1952 | 08/11/1952 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 22304 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1955 | 06/08/1955 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 22871 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/04/1958 | 10/05/1958 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22317 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/05/1958 | 08/06/1958 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 11/06/1959 | 26/06/1959 | 16 days | Unclassified | Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 30/09/1961 | 30/09/1961 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2066 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22157 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
25/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1927. Dep: 24/09/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6621 |
||
29/09/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
29/09/1927 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
12/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1929. Dep: 16/11/1929. | ||
14/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1932. Dep: 21/05/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1866 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/05/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1935. Dep: 01/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1417 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1852 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1940. Dep: 09/03/1940. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3662 (Diagram 15D) |
||
25/11/1940 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
20/07/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
12/08/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/08/1942. Dep: 15/08/1942. | ||
08/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1943. Dep: 31/07/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3676 (Diagram 15D) |
||
30/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1945. Dep: 28/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3668 (Diagram 15D) |
||
03/02/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
26/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3860 | ||
01/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1947. Dep: 22/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3669 (Diagram 15D) |
||
01/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1950. Dep: 22/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3679 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63860 |
||
01/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1952. Dep: 08/11/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22304 (Diagram 15D) |
||
25/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1955. Dep: 06/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22871 (Diagram 15D) |
||
16/09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
05/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1958. Dep: 10/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22317 (Diagram 15D) |
||
30/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/05/1958. Dep: 08/06/1958. | ||
11/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1959. Dep: 26/06/1959. Work undertaken: Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
||
10/04/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
30/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 30/09/1961. Dep: 30/09/1961. | ||
05/10/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63860 from Colwick (40E) |