Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 48 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4767 Week
» 15912 Month
» 115697 Year
» 1781073 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 2074 m/e 08/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6533   04/07/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3863   07/07/1946
British Railways 63863 w/e 20/05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/308/1919
O1 (2-8-0)01/09/1945
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22165
To Service During 08/1919
Taken into Stock 04/07/1925
Withdrawal Sun 20/06/1965 off Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)
Service Life 45 yrs, 10 mths , 20 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping R A Kings (Norwich)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to R A King, Norwich 8/65

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1919
GOR   Gorton on 02/07/1925
DON   Doncaster on 13/07/1925
GRA   Grantham on 27/09/1939
DON   Doncaster on 21/11/1942
CLK   Colwick on 06/09/1943
DON   Doncaster on 23/01/1944
GOR   Gorton on 09/09/1945
CLK   Colwick on 18/08/1946
GOR   Gorton on 20/10/1946
38B   Annesley on 16/07/1950
38A   Colwick on 03/11/1957
41H   Staveley (G.C.) on 09/06/1963
41E   Staveley (Barrow Hill) on 13/06/1965
     Withdrawn on 20/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 16/07/1950
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 29/06/1963
WDN   w/e 20/06/1965
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 2w/e 26/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1164)
09/11/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1181)
14/11/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 588)
09/06/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1130)
09/06/1934 Intensifore lubricator removed
27/06/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1310)
27/06/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
17/09/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3240)
21/09/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1949)
19/12/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3402)
01/09/1945 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5042)
06/12/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5114)
20/05/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5052)
26/07/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28383)
03/07/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28366)
08/12/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28363)
19/09/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28983)
14/12/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28202)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 04/04/1925 04/07/1925 92 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6533
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1927 29/10/1927 43 days General    
Gorton Works 05/10/1929 09/11/1929 36 days General Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/10/1931 14/11/1931 15 days General Boiler number 588 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/05/1934 09/06/1934 15 days General Boiler number 1130 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 06/06/1936 27/06/1936 22 days General Boiler number 1310 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1938 17/09/1938 29 days General Boiler number 3240 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/08/1940 21/09/1940 22 days General Boiler number 1949 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 03/11/1942 19/12/1942 47 days General Boiler number 3402 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1945 01/09/1945 78 days General Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5042 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 22/11/1947 06/12/1947 15 days General Boiler number 5114 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 06/05/1950 20/05/1950 15 days General Boiler number 5052 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63863
 
Gorton Works 21/06/1952 26/07/1952 36 days General Boiler number 28383 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 01/08/1953 22/08/1953 22 days Heavy Casual    
Gorton Works 05/06/1954 03/07/1954 29 days General Boiler number 28366 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 30/07/1955 20/08/1955 22 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 03/11/1956 08/12/1956 36 days General Boiler number 28363 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 22/08/1959 19/09/1959 29 days General Boiler number 28983 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 12/12/1959 12/12/1959 1 day Unclassified    
Gorton Works 30/01/1960 06/02/1960 8 days Light Casual    
Doncaster Works 31/10/1962 14/12/1962 45 days General Boiler number 28202 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2074
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22165
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
04/04/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1925. Dep: 04/07/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6533
   
02/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
04/07/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
13/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
17/09/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1927. Dep: 29/10/1927.    
05/10/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1929. Dep: 09/11/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15)
   
31/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1931. Dep: 14/11/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 588 (Diagram 15)
   
26/05/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1934. Dep: 09/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1130 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
06/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1936. Dep: 27/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1310 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
20/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1938. Dep: 17/09/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3240 (Diagram 15)
   
27/09/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
31/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1940. Dep: 21/09/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1949 (Diagram 15)
   
03/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1942. Dep: 19/12/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3402 (Diagram 15)
   
21/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
06/09/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
16/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1945. Dep: 01/09/1945.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5042 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/09/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
07/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3863    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
22/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1947. Dep: 06/12/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5114 (Diagram 100A)
   
06/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1950. Dep: 20/05/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5052 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63863
   
16/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
21/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1952. Dep: 26/07/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28383 (Diagram 100A)
   
01/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 01/08/1953. Dep: 22/08/1953.    
05/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1954. Dep: 03/07/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28366 (Diagram 100A)
   
30/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/07/1955. Dep: 20/08/1955.    
03/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1956. Dep: 08/12/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28363 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
22/08/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1959. Dep: 19/09/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28983 (Diagram 100A)
   
12/12/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/12/1959. Dep: 12/12/1959.    
30/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/01/1960. Dep: 06/02/1960.    
31/10/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1962. Dep: 14/12/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28202 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
20/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63863 from Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    

prev prev