|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 04/04/1925 | 04/07/1925 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6533 |
||
Gorton Works | 17/09/1927 | 29/10/1927 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/10/1929 | 09/11/1929 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/10/1931 | 14/11/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 588 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/05/1934 | 09/06/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1130 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
Gorton Works | 06/06/1936 | 27/06/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1310 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1938 | 17/09/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3240 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/08/1940 | 21/09/1940 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1949 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 03/11/1942 | 19/12/1942 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 3402 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/06/1945 | 01/09/1945 | 78 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5042 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/11/1947 | 06/12/1947 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 5114 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/05/1950 | 20/05/1950 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 5052 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63863 |
||
Gorton Works | 21/06/1952 | 26/07/1952 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28383 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/08/1953 | 22/08/1953 | 22 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 05/06/1954 | 03/07/1954 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28366 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1955 | 20/08/1955 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 03/11/1956 | 08/12/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28363 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/08/1959 | 19/09/1959 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28983 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/12/1959 | 12/12/1959 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 30/01/1960 | 06/02/1960 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/10/1962 | 14/12/1962 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28202 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2074 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22165 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
04/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1925. Dep: 04/07/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6533 |
||
02/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
04/07/1925 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
13/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
17/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1927. Dep: 29/10/1927. | ||
05/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1929. Dep: 09/11/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1181 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1931. Dep: 14/11/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 588 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1934. Dep: 09/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1130 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
06/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1936. Dep: 27/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1310 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
20/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1938. Dep: 17/09/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3240 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/09/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
31/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1940. Dep: 21/09/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1949 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1942. Dep: 19/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3402 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
06/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
16/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1945. Dep: 01/09/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5042 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/09/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
07/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3863 | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
22/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1947. Dep: 06/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5114 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1950. Dep: 20/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5052 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63863 |
||
16/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
21/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1952. Dep: 26/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28383 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 01/08/1953. Dep: 22/08/1953. | ||
05/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1954. Dep: 03/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28366 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/07/1955. Dep: 20/08/1955. | ||
03/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1956. Dep: 08/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28363 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
22/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1959. Dep: 19/09/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28983 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/12/1959. Dep: 12/12/1959. | ||
30/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/01/1960. Dep: 06/02/1960. | ||
31/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1962. Dep: 14/12/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28202 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
13/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) | ||
20/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63863 from Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |