Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 987 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 987 Week
» 19888 Month
» 19888 Year
» 1685264 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 2076 m/e 08/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6535   08/08/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3865   07/07/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E3865   23/02/1948
British Railways 63865 w/e 12/08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/308/1919
O1 (2-8-0)09/02/1946
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22167
To Service During 08/1919
Taken into Stock 08/08/1925
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/11/1962 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)
Service Life 43 yrs, 3 mths , 17 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Crewe for cutting up 9/63

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1919
GOR Gorton on 04/08/1925
DON Doncaster on 14/08/1925
GRA Grantham on 06/02/1933
DON Doncaster on 21/11/1942
CLK Colwick on 07/09/1943
DON Doncaster on 23/01/1944
MEX Mexborough on 12/03/1944
DON Doncaster on 27/08/1944
GOR Gorton on 17/02/1946
NWE New England on 23/05/1948
GOR Gorton on 14/07/1948
38B Annesley on 26/11/1950
   Withdrawn w/e 17/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton 9w/e 31/03/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley m/e 30/11/1950
LOAN 16D Annesley on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 17/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1491)
19/07/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1151)
23/07/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 487)
16/09/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1239)
06/07/1935 Intensifore lubricator removed
06/07/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1966)
29/01/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3315)
25/05/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3232)
24/04/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3330)
1946 Drop Grate fitted
09/02/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5049)
23/02/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5044)
10/08/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5040)
13/09/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28806)
13/11/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28299)
14/12/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28383)
23/09/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28118)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 16/05/1925 08/08/1925 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6535
 
Gorton Works 10/12/1927 21/01/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 28/06/1930 19/07/1930 22 days General
Boiler number 1151 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/07/1932 23/07/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 487 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/08/1933 16/09/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 1239 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/06/1935 06/07/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1966 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1938 29/01/1938 15 days General
Chimney altered
Boiler number 3315 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/05/1940 25/05/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 3232 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/04/1943 24/04/1943 11 days General
Boiler number 3330 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/07/1944 05/08/1944 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 24/11/1945 09/02/1946 78 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5049 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 1946 1946   Unclassified
Drop Grate fitted
 
Gorton Works 17/01/1948 23/02/1948 38 days General
Boiler number 5044 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3865
 
Gorton Works 15/07/1950 10/08/1950 27 days General
Boiler number 28286 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63865
 
Gorton Works 09/12/1950 13/01/1951 36 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 18/08/1952 13/09/1952 27 days General
Boiler number 28806 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 16/10/1953 14/11/1953 30 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 04/10/1954 13/11/1954 41 days General
Boiler number 28299 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 28/12/1955 28/01/1956 32 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 12/11/1956 14/12/1956 33 days General
Boiler number 28383 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1959 10/04/1959 32 days Light Intermediate  
Gorton Works 19/08/1961 23/09/1961 36 days General
Boiler number 28118 (Diagram 100A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1962 Annesley MPD The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. SLS/196212

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2076
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22167
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
04/08/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
08/08/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
14/08/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
06/02/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
21/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
07/09/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
12/03/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
27/08/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
17/02/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
07/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3865    
23/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
14/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
17/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63865 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev