Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 65 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 4537 Week
» 23438 Month
» 23438 Year
» 1688814 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 2078 m/e 08/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6623   02/04/1927
War Dept. 716   13/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22169
To Service During 08/1919
Taken into Stock 06/04/1927
Withdrawal Sat 13/09/1941 off Woodford Halse (WFD)
Service Life 22 yrs, 1 mth , 13 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Renumbered 716 and sent to the Middle East via Glasgow 15/9/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1919
WFD Woodford Halse on 06/04/1927
   Withdrawn on 13/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1002)
23/07/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1106)
12/01/1935 Intensifore lubricator removed
12/01/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1319)
23/01/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1259)
29/04/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1964)
23/08/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3378)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 12/02/1927 02/04/1927 50 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6623
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1929 30/11/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 09/07/1932 23/07/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1106 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/12/1934 12/01/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 1319 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 16/01/1937 23/01/1937 8 days General
Boiler number 1259 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/04/1939 29/04/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 1964 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1941 23/08/1941 13 days General
Boiler number 3378 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2078
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22169
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
06/04/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
06/04/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
13/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 716 from Woodford Halse (WFD)    
13/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 716    

prev prev