Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 39 Today
» 838 Yesterday
» 5596 Week
» 16741 Month
» 116526 Year
» 1781902 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 2079 m/e 08/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6624   18/08/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3867   02/06/1946
British Railways 63867 w/e 02/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/308/1919
O1 (2-8-0)02/09/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22170
To Service During 08/1919
Taken into Stock 16/08/1928
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/11/1962 off Annesley (16D)
Service Life 43 yrs, 3 mths , 17 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Notes
Notes Into Crewe for cutting up 8/63

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1919
CLK   Colwick on 16/08/1928
DON   Doncaster on 23/01/1944
MAR   March on 28/09/1944
ANN   Annesley on 31/01/1949
ANN   Annesley w/e 05/02/1949
     Withdrawn w/e 17/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 05/02/1949
LOAN 16D Annesley on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 17/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 924)
23/05/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 154)
02/09/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1069)
22/02/1936 Intensifore lubricator removed
22/02/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1198)
22/02/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
06/08/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3225)
14/12/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3339)
28/11/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3405)
02/09/1944 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5007)
27/07/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9436)
02/10/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5020)
25/11/1950 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28275)
20/09/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28384)
20/11/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28390)
16/02/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28362)
10/04/1959 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28381)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 26/05/1928 18/08/1928 85 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6624
 
Gorton Works 02/05/1931 23/05/1931 22 days General Boiler number 154 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/08/1933 02/09/1933 8 days General Boiler number 1069 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/02/1936 22/02/1936 15 days General Boiler number 1198 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 30/07/1938 06/08/1938 8 days General Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/12/1940 14/12/1940 8 days General Boiler number 3339 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 08/09/1942 28/11/1942 82 days General Boiler number 3405 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/07/1943 14/08/1943 19 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 13/04/1944 15/04/1944 3 days Light Repair Tender repairs only
 
Gorton Works 01/07/1944 02/09/1944 64 days General Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5007 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1946 27/07/1946 56 days General Boiler number 9436 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3867
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1948 02/10/1948 44 days General Boiler number 5020 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63867
 
Gorton Works 20/10/1950 25/11/1950 37 days General Boiler number 28275 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 23/08/1952 20/09/1952 29 days General Boiler number 28384 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 18/10/1954 20/11/1954 34 days General Boiler number 28390 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 12/05/1955 21/05/1955 10 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 18/01/1957 16/02/1957 30 days General Boiler number 28362 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 11/03/1959 10/04/1959 31 days General Boiler number 28381 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 29/12/1959 15/01/1960 18 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 10/11/1961 09/12/1961 30 days Light Intermediate    
Gorton Works 28/12/1961 28/12/1961 1 day Unclassified    
Gorton Works 23/05/1962 28/06/1962 37 days Light Casual    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1962 Annesley MPD The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. SLS/196212

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2079
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22170
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
26/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1928. Dep: 18/08/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6624
   
16/08/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
16/08/1928 To Stock To ROD stock    
02/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1931. Dep: 23/05/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 154 (Diagram 15)
   
26/08/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1933. Dep: 02/09/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1069 (Diagram 15)
   
08/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1936. Dep: 22/02/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1198 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
30/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1938. Dep: 06/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 15)
   
07/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1940. Dep: 14/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3339 (Diagram 15)
   
08/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1942. Dep: 28/11/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3405 (Diagram 15)
   
27/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/07/1943. Dep: 14/08/1943.    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
13/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/04/1944. Dep: 15/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender repairs only
   
01/07/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1944. Dep: 02/09/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5007 (Diagram 100A)
   
28/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
02/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1946. Dep: 27/07/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9436 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3867
   
20/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1948. Dep: 02/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5020 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63867
   
31/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
05/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
20/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1950. Dep: 25/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28275 (Diagram 100A)
   
23/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1952. Dep: 20/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28384 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1954. Dep: 20/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28390 (Diagram 100A)
   
12/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/05/1955. Dep: 21/05/1955.    
18/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1957. Dep: 16/02/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28362 (Diagram 100A)
   
11/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1959. Dep: 10/04/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28381 (Diagram 100A)
   
29/12/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/12/1959. Dep: 15/01/1960.    
10/11/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/11/1961. Dep: 09/12/1961.    
28/12/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/12/1961. Dep: 28/12/1961.    
23/05/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/05/1962. Dep: 28/06/1962.    
17/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63867 from Annesley (16D)    

prev prev