|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 26/02/1927 | 21/05/1927 | 85 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6627 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/08/1929 | 14/09/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 15/08/1931 | 29/08/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1243 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/09/1933 | 07/10/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1011 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1935 | 16/11/1935 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1221 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
Gorton Works | 07/11/1936 | 14/11/1936 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1340 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/09/1939 | 14/10/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1019 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 01/09/1942 | 17/10/1942 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 1254 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/07/1944 | 22/07/1944 | 4 days | Light Repair | Tender only |
||
Gorton Works | 09/06/1945 | 30/06/1945 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3405 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/01/1948 | 31/01/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3415 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3870 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/03/1951 | 31/03/1951 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22172 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63870 |
||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1951 | 15/09/1951 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 09/05/1953 | 30/05/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22136 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/06/1953 | 13/06/1953 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 22/05/1954 | 12/06/1954 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 10/06/1954 | 16/06/1954 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1956 | 21/04/1956 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22151 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/04/1956 | 30/04/1956 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1958 | 29/03/1958 | 8 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 04/10/1958 | 01/11/1958 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22874 (Diagram 15) Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 23/01/1962 | 23/01/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2084 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22175 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
26/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1927. Dep: 21/05/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6627 |
||
17/05/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
17/05/1927 | To Stock | To ROD stock | ||
10/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1929. Dep: 14/09/1929. | ||
15/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1931. Dep: 29/08/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1243 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1933. Dep: 07/10/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1011 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV) | ||
09/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1935. Dep: 16/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1221 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
29/11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV) | ||
07/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1936. Dep: 14/11/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1340 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
02/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
30/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1939. Dep: 14/10/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1019 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1942. Dep: 17/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1254 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
19/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/07/1944. Dep: 22/07/1944. Work undertaken: Tender only |
||
27/08/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
09/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1945. Dep: 30/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3405 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3870 | ||
25/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
10/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1948. Dep: 31/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3415 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3870 |
||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
10/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1951. Dep: 31/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22172 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63870 |
||
04/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/09/1951. Dep: 15/09/1951. | ||
09/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1953. Dep: 30/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22136 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/06/1953. Dep: 13/06/1953. | ||
22/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/05/1954. Dep: 12/06/1954. | ||
10/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/06/1954. Dep: 16/06/1954. | ||
17/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1956. Dep: 21/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22151 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/04/1956. Dep: 30/04/1956. | ||
22/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/03/1958. Dep: 29/03/1958. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
04/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1958. Dep: 01/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22874 (Diagram 15) Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
||
23/01/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 23/01/1962. Dep: 23/01/1962. | ||
26/01/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63870 from Langwith Junction (41J) |