|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 12/12/1927 | 10/03/1928 | 90 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6630 |
||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1930 | 13/08/1930 | 91 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1932 | 08/02/1932 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 1318 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/01/1934 | 27/01/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1967 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/11/1935 | 07/12/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 864 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/01/1938 | 22/01/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/05/1940 | 11/05/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/03/1942 | 14/03/1942 | 11 days | General | Boiler number 1082 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/03/1944 | 10/06/1944 | 80 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 9436 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/05/1946 | 22/06/1946 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 5083 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3874 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/02/1949 | 26/02/1949 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 9432 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63874 |
||
Gorton Works | 24/06/1949 | 29/07/1949 | 36 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 05/05/1951 | 02/06/1951 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28323 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/08/1952 | 18/10/1952 | 75 days | Light Casual | Westinghouse pumps fitted for working iron ore traffic Westinghouse Brake fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 26/02/1954 | 27/03/1954 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28825 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/06/1956 | 25/08/1956 | 68 days | General | Boiler number 28118 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 27/05/1958 | 20/06/1958 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 27/05/1959 | 03/07/1959 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 19/04/1960 | 04/06/1960 | 47 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 09/05/1961 | 02/08/1961 | 86 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28365 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/08/1961 | 02/09/1961 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 31/10/1961 | 30/11/1961 | 31 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1962 | 21/05/1962 | 11 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2096 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22186 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1927. Dep: 10/03/1928. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6630 |
||
10/03/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
10/03/1928 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
07/04/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
15/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1930. Dep: 13/08/1930. | ||
13/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1932. Dep: 08/02/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1318 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1934. Dep: 27/01/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1967 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1935. Dep: 07/12/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 864 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
08/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1938. Dep: 22/01/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1940. Dep: 11/05/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/07/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
04/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1942. Dep: 14/03/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1082 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1944. Dep: 10/06/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 9436 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/10/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
18/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
27/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1946. Dep: 22/06/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5083 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3874 |
||
15/06/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
02/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1949. Dep: 26/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9432 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63874 |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
24/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/06/1949. Dep: 29/07/1949. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
11/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
05/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
11/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
05/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1951. Dep: 02/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28323 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) | ||
05/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/08/1952. Dep: 18/10/1952. Work undertaken: Westinghouse pumps fitted for working iron ore traffic Westinghouse Brake fitted |
||
26/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1954. Dep: 27/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28825 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1956. Dep: 25/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28118 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/05/1958. Dep: 20/06/1958. | ||
27/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/05/1959. Dep: 03/07/1959. | ||
19/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/04/1960. Dep: 04/06/1960. | ||
09/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 09/05/1961. Dep: 02/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28365 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/08/1961. Dep: 02/09/1961. | ||
31/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/10/1961. Dep: 30/11/1961. | ||
11/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/05/1962. Dep: 21/05/1962. | ||
26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63874 from Tyne Dock (52H) |