Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 976 Today
» 1160 Yesterday
» 4301 Week
» 4301 Month
» 71163 Year
» 1736539 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 2096 m/e 06/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6630   10/03/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3874   22/06/1946
British Railways 63874 w/e 26/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/306/1919
O1 (2-8-0)10/06/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L713
Works Number 22186
To Service During 06/1919
Taken into Stock 10/03/1928
Withdrawal Mon 26/11/1962 off Tyne Dock (52H)
Service Life 43 yrs, 5 mths , 26 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 1/63

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1919
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 10/03/1928
HLS   Hull Springhead on 07/04/1930
HTN   Heaton on 06/07/1940
TDK   Tyne Dock on 19/10/1944
HLS   Hull Springhead on 18/06/1945
TDK   Tyne Dock on 15/06/1946
DAR   Darlington on 06/02/1949
DAR   Darlington w/e 12/02/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 11/09/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 17/09/1949
53C   Hull Springhead on 05/02/1950
53C   Hull Springhead w/e 11/02/1950
53A   Hull Dairycoates on 21/05/1950
54B   Tyne Dock on 02/09/1951
     Withdrawn on 26/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DAR Darlington w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC 53C Hull Springhead w/e 11/02/1950
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates on 21/05/1950
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock on 02/09/1951
WDN   on 26/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1286)
08/02/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1318)
27/01/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1967)
07/12/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 864)
22/01/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1118)
11/05/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1225)
14/03/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1082)
10/06/1944 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9436)
22/06/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5083)
26/02/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9432)
02/06/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28323)
18/10/1952 Westinghouse Brake fitted
27/03/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28825)
25/08/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28118)
02/08/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28365)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 12/12/1927 10/03/1928 90 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6630
 
Darlington Works 15/05/1930 13/08/1930 91 days General    
Darlington Works 13/01/1932 08/02/1932 27 days General Boiler number 1318 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/01/1934 27/01/1934 15 days General Boiler number 1967 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/11/1935 07/12/1935 15 days General Boiler number 864 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/01/1938 22/01/1938 15 days General Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1940 11/05/1940 8 days General Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1942 14/03/1942 11 days General Boiler number 1082 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/03/1944 10/06/1944 80 days General Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 9436 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1946 22/06/1946 27 days General Boiler number 5083 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3874
 
Gorton Works 02/02/1949 26/02/1949 25 days General Boiler number 9432 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63874
 
Gorton Works 24/06/1949 29/07/1949 36 days Light Casual After collision
 
Gorton Works 05/05/1951 02/06/1951 29 days General Boiler number 28323 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 05/08/1952 18/10/1952 75 days Light Casual Westinghouse pumps fitted for working iron ore traffic
Westinghouse Brake fitted
 
Gorton Works 26/02/1954 27/03/1954 30 days General Boiler number 28825 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 19/06/1956 25/08/1956 68 days General Boiler number 28118 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gateshead Works 27/05/1958 20/06/1958 25 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 27/05/1959 03/07/1959 38 days Heavy Intermediate    
Gorton Works 19/04/1960 04/06/1960 47 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 09/05/1961 02/08/1961 86 days Heavy Casual Boiler number 28365 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1961 02/09/1961 22 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 31/10/1961 30/11/1961 31 days Unclassified    
Darlington Works 11/05/1962 21/05/1962 11 days Light Casual    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2096
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22186
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/12/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1927. Dep: 10/03/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6630
   
10/03/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
10/03/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
07/04/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
15/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1930. Dep: 13/08/1930.    
13/01/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1932. Dep: 08/02/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1318 (Diagram 15)
   
13/01/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1934. Dep: 27/01/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1967 (Diagram 15)
   
23/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1935. Dep: 07/12/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 864 (Diagram 15)
   
08/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1938. Dep: 22/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15)
   
04/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1940. Dep: 11/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15)
   
06/07/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
04/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1942. Dep: 14/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1082 (Diagram 15)
   
23/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1944. Dep: 10/06/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 9436 (Diagram 100A)
   
19/10/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
18/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
27/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1946. Dep: 22/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5083 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3874
   
15/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
02/02/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1949. Dep: 26/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9432 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63874
   
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
12/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
24/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/06/1949. Dep: 29/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
11/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
17/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
05/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
11/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
21/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
05/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1951. Dep: 02/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28323 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
05/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/08/1952. Dep: 18/10/1952.
Work undertaken:
Westinghouse pumps fitted for working iron ore traffic
Westinghouse Brake fitted
   
26/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1954. Dep: 27/03/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28825 (Diagram 100A)
   
19/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1956. Dep: 25/08/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28118 (Diagram 100A)
   
27/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/05/1958. Dep: 20/06/1958.    
27/05/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/05/1959. Dep: 03/07/1959.    
19/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/04/1960. Dep: 04/06/1960.    
09/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 09/05/1961. Dep: 02/08/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28365 (Diagram 100A)
   
12/08/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/08/1961. Dep: 02/09/1961.    
31/10/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/10/1961. Dep: 30/11/1961.    
11/05/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/05/1962. Dep: 21/05/1962.    
26/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63874 from Tyne Dock (52H)    

prev prev