|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 05/09/1925 | 05/12/1925 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6528 |
||
Gorton Works | 17/11/1928 | 22/12/1928 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/11/1931 | 21/11/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1030 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/05/1934 | 19/05/1934 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 547 (Diagram 15) Eureka lubricator fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 10/10/1936 | 24/10/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1961 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1937 | 30/10/1937 | 15 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 06/05/1939 | 20/05/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 872 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/06/1941 | 05/07/1941 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/01/1944 | 29/01/1944 | 27 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3691 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/07/1946 | 17/08/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3697 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3876 |
||
Gorton Works | 06/11/1948 | 27/11/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3681 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63876 |
||
Gorton Works | 16/09/1950 | 30/09/1950 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22302 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/09/1952 | 18/10/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22339 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/06/1953 | 13/06/1953 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 29/01/1955 | 26/02/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22346 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/02/1955 | 18/03/1955 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 02/03/1959 | 02/03/1959 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2099 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22189 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2857 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
05/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1925. Dep: 05/12/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6528 |
||
04/12/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
05/12/1925 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
09/01/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
17/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1928. Dep: 22/12/1928. | ||
07/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1931. Dep: 21/11/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1030 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/05/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1934. Dep: 19/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 547 (Diagram 15) Eureka lubricator fitted |
||
10/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1936. Dep: 24/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1961 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
16/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/10/1937. Dep: 30/10/1937. | ||
06/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1939. Dep: 20/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 872 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1941. Dep: 05/07/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1941 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1944. Dep: 29/01/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3691 (Diagram 15D) |
||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
23/09/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
27/07/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1946. Dep: 17/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3697 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3876 |
||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
30/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
06/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1948. Dep: 27/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3681 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63876 |
||
20/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
26/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
16/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1950. Dep: 30/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22302 (Diagram 15D) |
||
27/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1952. Dep: 18/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22339 (Diagram 15D) |
||
06/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/06/1953. Dep: 13/06/1953. | ||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
29/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1955. Dep: 26/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22346 (Diagram 15D) |
||
28/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/02/1955. Dep: 18/03/1955. | ||
29/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
02/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 02/03/1959. Dep: 02/03/1959. | ||
10/03/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63876 from Mexborough (41F) |