|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 21/02/1924 | 19/08/1924 | 181 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/2 Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6286 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 29/10/1925 | 11/11/1925 | 14 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/03/1927 | 27/05/1927 | 85 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/11/1927 | 24/11/1927 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/06/1928 | 11/07/1928 | 20 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/11/1928 | 23/11/1928 | 16 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/10/1929 | 16/11/1929 | 45 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/12/1929 | 11/01/1930 | 17 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/02/1930 | 21/02/1930 | 3 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/02/1930 | 13/03/1930 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/10/1931 | 25/11/1931 | 34 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/08/1932 | 25/08/1932 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1932 | 07/10/1932 | 44 days | General | New chimney fitted Boiler number C1468 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/06/1935 | 13/07/1935 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 870 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/04/1937 | 24/04/1937 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 1377 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1937 | 11/12/1937 | 37 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1939 | 05/05/1939 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1249 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/07/1941 | 01/09/1941 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 1232 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/02/1944 | 18/03/1944 | 40 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 5101 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/01/1947 | 22/02/1947 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 3664 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/09/1949 | 15/10/1949 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 3676 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63880 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/08/1952 | 30/08/1952 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 22338 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1952 | 12/11/1952 | 28 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 29/03/1955 | 07/05/1955 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 22308 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/11/1957 | 28/12/1957 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 22320 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/05/1960 | 30/07/1960 | 62 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 18/08/1960 | 30/08/1960 | 13 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2112 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22202 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
21/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1924. Dep: 19/08/1924. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/2 Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6286 |
||
19/08/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (DFU) | ||
19/08/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
29/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1925. Dep: 11/11/1925. | ||
04/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1927. Dep: 27/05/1927. | ||
05/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/11/1927. Dep: 24/11/1927. | ||
22/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/06/1928. Dep: 11/07/1928. | ||
08/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/11/1928. Dep: 23/11/1928. | ||
03/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1929. Dep: 16/11/1929. | ||
26/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/12/1929. Dep: 11/01/1930. | ||
19/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/02/1930. Dep: 21/02/1930. | ||
28/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/02/1930. Dep: 13/03/1930. | ||
12/03/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
09/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
23/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 23/10/1931. Dep: 25/11/1931. | ||
17/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/08/1932. Dep: 25/08/1932. | ||
25/08/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1932. Dep: 07/10/1932. Work undertaken: New chimney fitted Boiler number C1468 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1935. Dep: 13/07/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 870 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1937. Dep: 24/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1377 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/11/1937. Dep: 11/12/1937. | ||
17/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1939. Dep: 05/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1249 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1941. Dep: 01/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1232 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
08/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1944. Dep: 18/03/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 5101 (Diagram 15D) |
||
07/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
25/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3880 | ||
02/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1947. Dep: 22/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3664 (Diagram 15D) |
||
22/12/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
05/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1949. Dep: 15/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3676 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63880 |
||
18/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
24/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
11/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
08/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1952. Dep: 30/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22338 (Diagram 15D) |
||
16/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/10/1952. Dep: 12/11/1952. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
29/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1955. Dep: 07/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22308 (Diagram 15D) |
||
22/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1957. Dep: 28/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22320 (Diagram 15D) |
||
30/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 30/05/1960. Dep: 30/07/1960. | ||
18/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/08/1960. Dep: 30/08/1960. | ||
17/03/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63880 from Frodingham (36C) |