Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 178 Today
» 1120 Yesterday
» 3567 Week
» 22468 Month
» 22468 Year
» 1687844 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 2134 m/e 09/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6636   02/08/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3887   23/06/1946
British Railways 63887 w/e 04/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/309/1919
O1 (2-8-0)02/03/1946
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L713
Works Number 22224
To Service During 09/1919
Taken into Stock 02/08/1927
Withdrawal w/e Sat 02/03/1963 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Service Life 43 yrs, 6 mths , -1 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Cut up at Doncaster

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1919
DON Doncaster on 02/08/1927
MEX Mexborough on 23/11/1936
LNG Langwith Junction on 11/05/1937
FRO Frodingham on 12/03/1939
GOR Gorton on 12/05/1946
WFD Woodford Halse on 18/08/1946
GOR Gorton on 20/10/1946
38B Annesley on 26/11/1950
31B March on 14/04/1957
41H Staveley (G.C.) on 16/09/1962
   Withdrawn w/e 02/03/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 20/04/1957
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   on 02/03/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1142)
20/08/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1416)
16/07/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1023)
07/10/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1154)
11/08/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1365)
31/10/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1207)
31/10/1936 Intensifore lubricator removed
28/01/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1252)
27/07/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3407)
02/05/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1095)
22/07/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1266)
02/03/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5051)
04/1946 Drop Grate fitted
04/09/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5085)
16/06/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28809)
11/04/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28336)
30/11/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28824)
23/11/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28283)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 02/07/1927 02/08/1927 32 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6636
 
Gorton Works 02/07/1929 20/08/1929 50 days General
Boiler number 1416 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/05/1931 16/07/1931 53 days General
Boiler number 1023 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1933 07/10/1933 55 days General
Boiler number 1154 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/07/1934 11/08/1934 27 days General
Boiler number 1365 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1936 31/10/1936 38 days General
Boiler number 1207 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1938 28/01/1939 58 days General
Boiler number 1252 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/06/1940 27/07/1940 36 days General
Boiler number 3407 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/03/1942 02/05/1942 42 days General
Boiler number 1095 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/06/1944 22/07/1944 26 days General
Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/11/1945 02/03/1946 115 days General
Rebuilt to class O1
 
Gorton Works 1946 04/1946   Unclassified
Boiler number 5051 (Diagram 100A)
Drop Grate fitted
 
Gorton Works 25/07/1948 04/09/1948 42 days General
Boiler number 5085 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63887
 
Gorton Works 07/05/1951 16/06/1951 41 days General
Boiler number 28809 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 11/03/1953 11/04/1953 32 days General
Boiler number 28336 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 12/07/1954 28/08/1954 48 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 31/08/1954 02/09/1954 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 20/08/1955 30/11/1955 103 days General
Boiler number 28824 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 31/07/1956 01/09/1956 33 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 15/01/1957 23/02/1957 40 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 31/10/1957 23/11/1957 24 days General
Boiler number 28283 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1957 25/12/1957 30 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 01/10/1960 09/11/1960 40 days General  
Doncaster Works 15/02/1963 15/02/1963 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2134
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22224
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
02/08/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
02/08/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
23/11/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
11/05/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
12/03/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
12/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
23/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3887    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
14/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
16/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
02/03/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63887 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev