|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 02/07/1927 | 02/08/1927 | 32 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6636 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/07/1929 | 20/08/1929 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1416 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/05/1931 | 16/07/1931 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 1023 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/08/1933 | 07/10/1933 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 1154 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/07/1934 | 11/08/1934 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 1365 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/09/1936 | 31/10/1936 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 1207 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1938 | 28/01/1939 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 1252 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/06/1940 | 27/07/1940 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3407 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1942 | 02/05/1942 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 1095 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/06/1944 | 22/07/1944 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/11/1945 | 02/03/1946 | 115 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 |
||
Gorton Works | 1946 | 04/1946 | Unclassified | Boiler number 5051 (Diagram 100A) Drop Grate fitted |
|||
Gorton Works | 25/07/1948 | 04/09/1948 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 5085 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63887 |
||
Gorton Works | 07/05/1951 | 16/06/1951 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 28809 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/03/1953 | 11/04/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28336 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/07/1954 | 28/08/1954 | 48 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 31/08/1954 | 02/09/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1955 | 30/11/1955 | 103 days | General | Boiler number 28824 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/07/1956 | 01/09/1956 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 15/01/1957 | 23/02/1957 | 40 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 31/10/1957 | 23/11/1957 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28283 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1957 | 25/12/1957 | 30 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 01/10/1960 | 09/11/1960 | 40 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/02/1963 | 15/02/1963 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
10/03/1963 | Doncaster Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. | SLS/196304 |
11/05/1963 | Worcester Works (Scrap Yard) | 4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2134 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22224 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
02/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1927. Dep: 02/08/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6636 |
||
02/08/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
02/08/1927 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
02/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1929. Dep: 20/08/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1416 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1931. Dep: 16/07/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1023 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1933. Dep: 07/10/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1154 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1934. Dep: 11/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1365 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1936. Dep: 31/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1207 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
23/11/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
11/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
02/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1938. Dep: 28/01/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1252 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/03/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
22/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1940. Dep: 27/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3407 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1942. Dep: 02/05/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1095 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1944. Dep: 22/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1266 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/11/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1945. Dep: 02/03/1946. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 |
||
1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/1946. Dep: ?/04/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5051 (Diagram 100A) Drop Grate fitted |
||
12/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
23/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3887 | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
25/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1948. Dep: 04/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5085 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63887 |
||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
07/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1951. Dep: 16/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28809 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1953. Dep: 11/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28336 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/07/1954. Dep: 28/08/1954. | ||
31/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/08/1954. Dep: 02/09/1954. | ||
20/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1955. Dep: 30/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28824 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/07/1956. Dep: 01/09/1956. | ||
15/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/01/1957. Dep: 23/02/1957. | ||
14/04/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
31/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1957. Dep: 23/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28283 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/11/1957. Dep: 25/12/1957. | ||
01/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1960. Dep: 09/11/1960. | ||
16/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
15/02/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 15/02/1963. Dep: 15/02/1963. | ||
02/03/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63887 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |