Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 20 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 20 Week
» 7632 Month
» 74494 Year
» 1739870 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 2135 m/e 09/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6637   23/04/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3888   02/11/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E3888   05/02/1948
British Railways 63888 w/e 08/07/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L713
Works Number 22225
To Service During 09/1919
Taken into Stock 22/04/1927
Withdrawal Fri 01/04/1960 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Service Life 40 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy
Information Hyde Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1919
GOR   Gorton on 22/04/1927
LIV   Brunswick on 03/11/1933
GOR   Gorton on 29/11/1935
ARD   Ardsley on 25/11/1945
MEX   Mexborough on 18/08/1946
SHF   Sheffield Darnall on 27/04/1947
     Withdrawn on 01/04/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ARD Ardsley m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall on 27/04/1947
WDN   on 01/04/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1008)
25/07/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1154)
30/09/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1169)
18/01/1936 Intensifore lubricator removed
18/01/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1049)
18/01/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
23/07/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3337)
21/12/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3415)
03/11/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3422)
05/02/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1070)
01/07/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3387)
20/12/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22110)
24/12/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22192)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 12/02/1927 23/04/1927 71 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6637
 
Gorton Works 06/07/1929 03/08/1929 29 days General    
Gorton Works 27/06/1931 25/07/1931 29 days General Boiler number 1154 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/09/1933 30/09/1933 8 days General Boiler number 1169 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/12/1935 18/01/1936 22 days General Boiler number 1049 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 09/07/1938 23/07/1938 15 days General Boiler number 3337 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/12/1940 21/12/1940 8 days General Boiler number 3415 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1943 15/05/1943 12 days General    
Gorton Works 20/10/1945 03/11/1945 15 days General Boiler number 3422 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/12/1947 05/02/1948 42 days General Boiler number 1070 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3888
 
Gorton Works 17/06/1950 01/07/1950 15 days General Boiler number 3387 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63888
 
Gorton Works 04/07/1950 15/07/1950 12 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 06/12/1952 20/12/1952 15 days General Boiler number 22110 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/12/1952 30/12/1952 8 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 19/11/1955 24/12/1955 36 days General Boiler number 22192 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1960 31/03/1960 1 day No repairs    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2135
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22225
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1927. Dep: 23/04/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6637
   
22/04/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
22/04/1927 To Stock To ROD stock    
06/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1929. Dep: 03/08/1929.    
27/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1931. Dep: 25/07/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1154 (Diagram 15)
   
23/09/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1933. Dep: 30/09/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1169 (Diagram 15)
   
03/11/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV)    
29/11/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
28/12/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1935. Dep: 18/01/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1049 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
09/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1938. Dep: 23/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3337 (Diagram 15)
   
14/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1940. Dep: 21/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3415 (Diagram 15)
   
04/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1943. Dep: 15/05/1943.    
20/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1945. Dep: 03/11/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3422 (Diagram 15)
   
25/11/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
02/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3888    
27/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
26/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/12/1947. Dep: 05/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1070 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3888
   
17/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1950. Dep: 01/07/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3387 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63888
   
04/07/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/07/1950. Dep: 15/07/1950.    
06/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1952. Dep: 20/12/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22110 (Diagram 15)
   
23/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/12/1952. Dep: 30/12/1952.    
19/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1955. Dep: 24/12/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22192 (Diagram 15)
   
31/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 31/03/1960. Dep: 31/03/1960.    
01/04/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 63888 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev