Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 288 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 2557 Week
» 21458 Month
» 21458 Year
» 1686834 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 2136 m/e 09/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6638   14/05/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3889   07/07/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E3889   31/01/1948
British Railways 63889 w/e 23/09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L713
Works Number 22226
To Service During 09/1919
Taken into Stock 12/05/1927
Withdrawal Wed 02/12/1959 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 40 yrs, 3 mths , 1 dy
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1919
CAM Cambridge on 12/05/1927
LNG Langwith Junction on 04/06/1927
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 07/09/1929
STV Staveley (G.C.) on 23/01/1934
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 06/02/1949
   Withdrawn on 02/12/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 02/12/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1013)
16/04/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1141)
02/11/1935 Intensifore lubricator removed
02/11/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1288)
04/12/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3218)
13/07/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3328)
13/11/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1882)
27/11/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3283)
26/01/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3315)
31/01/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3398)
16/09/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22107)
10/01/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22890)
17/12/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22296)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 26/02/1927 14/05/1927 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6638
 
Gorton Works 15/06/1929 13/07/1929 29 days General  
Gorton Works 09/04/1932 16/04/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1141 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/10/1935 02/11/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1288 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 27/11/1937 04/12/1937 8 days General
Boiler number 3218 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/07/1940 13/07/1940 8 days General
Boiler number 3328 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 06/10/1942 13/11/1942 39 days General
Boiler number 1882 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1943 27/11/1943 3 days Light Repair
Boiler number 3283 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/01/1946 26/01/1946 15 days General
Boiler number 3315 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/01/1948 31/01/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3398 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3889
 
Gorton Works 02/09/1950 16/09/1950 15 days General
Boiler number 22107 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63889
 
Gorton Works 13/12/1952 10/01/1953 29 days General
Boiler number 22890 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/01/1953 15/01/1953 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 19/12/1953 26/12/1953 8 days Light Casual
After collision
 
Gorton Works 19/11/1955 17/12/1955 29 days General
Boiler number 22296 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/06/1957 06/07/1957 29 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 11/07/1957 12/07/1957 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 17/11/1959 17/11/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2136
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22226
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/05/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
12/05/1927 To Stock To ROD stock    
04/06/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
07/09/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
23/01/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
07/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3889    
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
02/12/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63889 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev