|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 26/02/1927 | 14/05/1927 | 78 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6638 |
||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1929 | 13/07/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1932 | 16/04/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1141 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/10/1935 | 02/11/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1288 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
Gorton Works | 27/11/1937 | 04/12/1937 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3218 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/07/1940 | 13/07/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3328 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 06/10/1942 | 13/11/1942 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 1882 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/11/1943 | 27/11/1943 | 3 days | Light Repair | Boiler number 3283 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/01/1946 | 26/01/1946 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3315 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/01/1948 | 31/01/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3398 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3889 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/09/1950 | 16/09/1950 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22107 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63889 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/12/1952 | 10/01/1953 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22890 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/01/1953 | 15/01/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 19/12/1953 | 26/12/1953 | 8 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 19/11/1955 | 17/12/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22296 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/06/1957 | 06/07/1957 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 11/07/1957 | 12/07/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 17/11/1959 | 17/11/1959 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1962 | Annesley MPD | The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. | SLS/196212 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2136 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22226 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
26/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1927. Dep: 14/05/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6638 |
||
12/05/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
12/05/1927 | To Stock | To ROD stock | ||
04/06/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
15/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1929. Dep: 13/07/1929. | ||
07/09/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
09/04/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1932. Dep: 16/04/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1141 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/01/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
19/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1935. Dep: 02/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1288 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
27/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1937. Dep: 04/12/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3218 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1940. Dep: 13/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3328 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1942. Dep: 13/11/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1882 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/11/1943. Dep: 27/11/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3283 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1946. Dep: 26/01/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3315 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3889 | ||
10/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1948. Dep: 31/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3398 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3889 |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
02/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1950. Dep: 16/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22107 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63889 |
||
13/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1952. Dep: 10/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22890 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/01/1953. Dep: 15/01/1953. | ||
19/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/12/1953. Dep: 26/12/1953. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
19/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1955. Dep: 17/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22296 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/06/1957. Dep: 06/07/1957. | ||
11/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/07/1957. Dep: 12/07/1957. | ||
17/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 17/11/1959. Dep: 17/11/1959. | ||
02/12/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63889 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) |