Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 64 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2990 Week
» 4728 Month
» 132171 Year
» 1797547 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 2144 m/e 05/1919
London and North Western Railway 2846 m/e 09/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6639   09/11/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3890   06/07/1946
British Railways 63890 w/e 26/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/305/1919
O1 (2-8-0)06/07/1946
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L714
Works Number 22234
To Service During 05/1919
Taken into Stock 09/11/1927
Withdrawal w/e Sun 17/03/1963 off March (31B)
Service Life 43 yrs, 10 mths , 15 dys
Information Atlas Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 27/3/63

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1919
91LNWR   (on loan)   09/1919
ROD       08/1921
IMM   Immingham on 09/11/1927
91W   To Western Region / GWR (on loan) on 22/11/1940
WFD   Woodford Halse on 20/07/1942
STV   Staveley (G.C.) on 03/04/1944
GOR   Gorton on 14/07/1946
WFD   Woodford Halse on 18/08/1946
GOR   Gorton on 20/10/1946
38B   Annesley on 26/11/1950
38B   Annesley m/e 30/11/1950
31B   March on 14/04/1957
     Withdrawn w/e 17/03/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 20/04/1957
WDN   on 17/03/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1221)
08/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1211)
07/04/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1756)
28/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1147)
01/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 42)
22/08/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1414)
12/08/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3205)
06/07/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5079)
01/1947 Drop Grate fitted
26/06/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5049)
13/01/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28805)
23/02/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28826)
14/02/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28290)
23/10/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28805)
16/06/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28297)
11/01/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28367)
03/02/1962 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 22/10/1927 09/11/1927 19 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6639
 
Gorton Works 28/12/1929 04/01/1930 8 days General    
Gorton Works 03/08/1932 14/08/1932 12 days General    
Gorton Works 02/04/1935 16/04/1935 15 days General Boiler number 1756 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 1937 28/08/1937   General Boiler number 1147 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 1940 01/1940   General Boiler number 42 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/07/1942 22/08/1942 26 days General Boiler number 1414 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/07/1944 12/08/1944 21 days General Boiler number 3205 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/03/1946 06/07/1946 113 days General Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5079 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3890
 
Gorton Works 1947 01/1947   Unclassified Drop Grate fitted
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1948 26/06/1948 31 days General Boiler number 5049 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63890
 
Gorton Works 23/12/1950 13/01/1951 22 days General Boiler number 28805 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 24/01/1952 23/02/1952 31 days General Boiler number 28826 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 24/01/1953 14/02/1953 22 days General Boiler number 28290 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 18/09/1954 23/10/1954 36 days General Boiler number 28805 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 15/06/1955 30/07/1955 46 days Heavy Intermediate    
Gorton Works 08/05/1956 16/06/1956 40 days General Boiler number 28297 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 23/02/1957 09/03/1957 15 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 14/12/1957 11/01/1958 29 days General Boiler number 28367 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 10/12/1960 21/01/1961 43 days Heavy Intermediate    
Gorton Works 16/12/1961 03/02/1962 50 days Light Casual Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/12/1960 Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2144
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22234
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2846    
08/1921 Allocation      
22/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1927. Dep: 09/11/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6639
   
09/11/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
09/11/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
28/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1929. Dep: 04/01/1930.    
08/1932 Modification Diagram 15 number 1211 boiler fitted    
03/08/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1932. Dep: 14/08/1932.    
02/04/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1935. Dep: 16/04/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1756 (Diagram 15)
   
1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1937. Dep: 28/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1147 (Diagram 15)
   
1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: ?/1940. Dep: ?/01/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 42 (Diagram 15)
   
22/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
20/07/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
28/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1942. Dep: 22/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1414 (Diagram 15)
   
03/04/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
23/07/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1944. Dep: 12/08/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3205 (Diagram 15)
   
16/03/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1946. Dep: 06/07/1946.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5079 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3890
   
14/07/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/1947. Dep: ?/01/1947.
Work undertaken:
Drop Grate fitted
   
27/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1948. Dep: 26/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5049 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63890
   
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
23/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1950. Dep: 13/01/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28805 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1952. Dep: 23/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28826 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1953. Dep: 14/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28290 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1954. Dep: 23/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28805 (Diagram 100A)
   
15/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/06/1955. Dep: 30/07/1955.    
08/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1956. Dep: 16/06/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28297 (Diagram 100A)
   
23/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/02/1957. Dep: 09/03/1957.    
14/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
14/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1957. Dep: 11/01/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28367 (Diagram 100A)
   
10/12/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/12/1960. Dep: 21/01/1961.    
16/12/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/12/1961. Dep: 03/02/1962.
Work undertaken:
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
17/03/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63890 from March (31B)    

prev prev