|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 12/04/1924 | 21/06/1924 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6295 |
||
Gorton Works | 21/08/1926 | 06/11/1926 | 78 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/01/1929 | 23/02/1929 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 31/01/1931 | 14/02/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1127 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/08/1933 | 26/08/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1457 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/11/1935 | 07/12/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1021 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/05/1938 | 28/05/1938 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1010 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/06/1940 | 15/06/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3400 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1943 | 20/03/1943 | 25 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3688 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/09/1945 | 22/09/1945 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22313 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/08/1946 | 31/08/1946 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3681 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/07/1948 | 13/08/1948 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3686 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63891 |
||
Gorton Works | 30/04/1949 | 28/05/1949 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 01/09/1951 | 29/09/1951 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22322 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/10/1951 | 06/10/1951 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 24/10/1953 | 14/11/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22318 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/11/1953 | 19/11/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1954 | 20/10/1954 | 48 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 08/12/1954 | 29/01/1955 | 53 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 01/02/1955 | 03/02/1955 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 11/08/1956 | 15/09/1956 | 36 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22330 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/10/1957 | 09/11/1957 | 35 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 07/09/1961 | 07/09/1961 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2145 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22235 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2847 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
12/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1924. Dep: 21/06/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6295 |
||
21/06/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
21/06/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
21/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1926. Dep: 06/11/1926. | ||
26/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1929. Dep: 23/02/1929. | ||
08/03/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
15/08/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
14/10/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
31/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1931. Dep: 14/02/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1127 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1933. Dep: 26/08/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1457 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/11/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1935. Dep: 07/12/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1021 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
30/01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
21/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1938. Dep: 28/05/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1010 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1940. Dep: 15/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3400 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/11/1940 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
30/01/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
24/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1943. Dep: 20/03/1943. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3688 (Diagram 15D) |
||
20/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
08/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1945. Dep: 22/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22313 (Diagram 15D) |
||
06/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3891 | ||
17/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1946. Dep: 31/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3681 (Diagram 15D) |
||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
08/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1948. Dep: 13/08/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3686 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63891 |
||
30/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1949. Dep: 28/05/1949. | ||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
01/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1951. Dep: 29/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22322 (Diagram 15D) |
||
02/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/10/1951. Dep: 06/10/1951. | ||
24/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1953. Dep: 14/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22318 (Diagram 15D) |
||
17/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/11/1953. Dep: 19/11/1953. | ||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
03/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/09/1954. Dep: 20/10/1954. | ||
08/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/12/1954. Dep: 29/01/1955. | ||
01/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/02/1955. Dep: 03/02/1955. | ||
29/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
11/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/08/1956. Dep: 15/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22330 (Diagram 15D) |
||
06/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/10/1957. Dep: 09/11/1957. | ||
07/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 07/09/1961. Dep: 07/09/1961. | ||
13/09/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63891 from Mexborough (41F) |