|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 1924 | 10/05/1924 | Heavy | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6293 |
|||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1926 | 02/03/1927 | 118 days | General | Boiler number 1881 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/04/1929 | 11/06/1929 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 1943 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/03/1931 | 12/05/1931 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 864 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/04/1933 | 06/05/1933 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1876 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1935 | 13/06/1935 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 828 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
Gorton Works | 17/09/1936 | 24/10/1936 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 1964 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1939 | 22/04/1939 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3366 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1940 | 11/01/1941 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/01/1943 | 20/02/1943 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 864 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/11/1944 | 22/12/1944 | 36 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 5029 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/02/1947 | 31/03/1947 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 5097 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/01/1948 | 17/02/1948 | 48 days | Heavy | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3893 |
||
Gorton Works | 04/04/1949 | 14/05/1949 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 5004 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63893 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/02/1951 | 14/04/1951 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 28310 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/04/1951 | 20/04/1951 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 30/04/1953 | 28/05/1953 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28395 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/10/1954 | 30/11/1954 | 40 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28118 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/12/1955 | 12/01/1956 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28802 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/11/1957 | 14/12/1957 | 26 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28385 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/01/1959 | 07/02/1959 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28897 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/04/1962 | 06/06/1962 | 41 days | Light Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2148 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22238 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2852 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: ?/1924. Dep: 10/05/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6293 |
||
06/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
10/05/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
05/11/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1926. Dep: 02/03/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1881 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1929. Dep: 11/06/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1943 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1931. Dep: 12/05/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 864 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1933. Dep: 06/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1876 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1935. Dep: 13/06/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 828 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
17/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1936. Dep: 24/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1964 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1939. Dep: 22/04/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3366 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1940. Dep: 11/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1943. Dep: 20/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 864 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1944. Dep: 22/12/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 5029 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/04/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
28/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3893 | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
07/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1947. Dep: 31/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5097 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
01/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 01/01/1948. Dep: 17/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3893 |
||
04/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1949. Dep: 14/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5004 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63893 |
||
08/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
28/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1951. Dep: 14/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28310 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/04/1951. Dep: 20/04/1951. | ||
11/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
17/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
30/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1953. Dep: 28/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28395 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/10/1954. Dep: 30/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28118 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
05/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1955. Dep: 12/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28802 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 19/11/1957. Dep: 14/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28385 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1959. Dep: 07/02/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28897 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
27/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 27/04/1962. Dep: 06/06/1962. | ||
20/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63893 from Langwith Junction (41J) |