|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 12/04/1924 | 12/07/1924 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6296 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/03/1927 | 30/04/1927 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/07/1929 | 31/08/1929 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1366 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/04/1931 | 16/05/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1077 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/08/1933 | 12/08/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1217 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/10/1935 | 09/11/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1139 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/11/1937 | 20/11/1937 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1859 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/06/1940 | 08/06/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3336 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 28/12/1942 | 13/02/1943 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 1949 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/03/1944 | 18/03/1944 | 3 days | Light Repair | Tender only |
||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1945 | 17/03/1945 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1187 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/11/1947 | 13/12/1947 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3243 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/07/1948 | 07/08/1948 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63895 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/01/1950 | 18/02/1950 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1256 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/05/1952 | 24/05/1952 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22271 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/12/1954 | 19/02/1955 | 57 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28395 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/09/1957 | 12/10/1957 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28378 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/10/1957 | 22/10/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 01/11/1957 | 05/11/1957 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 10/10/1959 | 09/11/1959 | 31 days | Light Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2150 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22240 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2840 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
12/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1924. Dep: 12/07/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6296 |
||
08/07/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
12/07/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
03/02/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
12/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1927. Dep: 30/04/1927. | ||
16/09/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
27/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1929. Dep: 31/08/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1366 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1931. Dep: 16/05/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1077 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1933. Dep: 12/08/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1217 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1935. Dep: 09/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1139 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
13/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1937. Dep: 20/11/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1859 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1940. Dep: 08/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3336 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1942. Dep: 13/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1949 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/03/1944. Dep: 18/03/1944. Work undertaken: Tender only |
||
17/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1945. Dep: 17/03/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1187 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3895 | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
15/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1947. Dep: 13/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3243 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
03/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
24/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/07/1948. Dep: 07/08/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63895 |
||
28/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1950. Dep: 18/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1256 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
10/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1952. Dep: 24/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22271 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/12/1954. Dep: 19/02/1955. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28395 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1957. Dep: 12/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28378 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/10/1957. Dep: 22/10/1957. | ||
01/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/11/1957. Dep: 05/11/1957. | ||
10/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/10/1959. Dep: 09/11/1959. | ||
21/07/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63895 from Gorton (9G) |