Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 24 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 842 Week
» 17793 Month
» 170746 Year
» 1836122 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 2152 m/e 06/1919
London and North Western Railway 2841 m/e 09/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6530   20/02/1926
War Dept. 727   13/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L714
Works Number 22242
To Service During 06/1919
Taken into Stock 20/02/1926
Withdrawal Sat 13/09/1941 off Colwick (CLK)
Service Life 22 yrs, 3 mths , 13 dys
Information Atlas Works

Disposal

Notes
Notes Renumbered 727 and sent to the Middle East via Glasgow 8/10/41

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1919
91LNWR   (on loan)   09/1919
ROD       08/1921
GOR   Gorton on 16/02/1926
CLK   Colwick on 02/03/1926
     Withdrawn on 13/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1100)
20/06/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1385)
23/12/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1468)
18/07/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1464)
21/01/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1150)
08/02/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3340)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 26/12/1925 20/02/1926 57 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6530
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1929 06/04/1929 29 days General    
Gorton Works 23/05/1931 20/06/1931 29 days General Boiler number 1385 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/12/1933 23/12/1933 15 days General Boiler number 1468 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/03/1934 31/03/1934 15 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 04/07/1936 18/07/1936 15 days General Boiler number 1464 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/01/1939 21/01/1939 15 days General Boiler number 1150 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/02/1941 08/02/1941 8 days General Boiler number 3340 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2152
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22242
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2841    
08/1921 Allocation      
26/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/12/1925. Dep: 20/02/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6530
   
16/02/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
20/02/1926 To Stock To LNER stock    
02/03/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
09/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1929. Dep: 06/04/1929.    
23/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1931. Dep: 20/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1385 (Diagram 15)
   
09/12/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1933. Dep: 23/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1468 (Diagram 15)
   
17/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/03/1934. Dep: 31/03/1934.    
04/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1936. Dep: 18/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1464 (Diagram 15)
   
07/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1939. Dep: 21/01/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1150 (Diagram 15)
   
01/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1941. Dep: 08/02/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3340 (Diagram 15)
   
13/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 727 from Colwick (CLK)    
13/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 727    

prev prev