|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 21/05/1927 | 20/08/1927 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6641 |
||
Gorton Works | 26/04/1930 | 24/05/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1030 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/10/1931 | 07/11/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1353 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1934 | 14/04/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 820 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/08/1936 | 19/09/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 803 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
Gorton Works | 04/03/1939 | 11/03/1939 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3362 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/05/1941 | 07/06/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3241 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/07/1943 | 31/07/1943 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 3248 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1945 | 08/09/1945 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3402 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/08/1947 | 06/09/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3387 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/02/1950 | 25/02/1950 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63900 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1952 | 26/04/1952 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22119 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/04/1952 | 30/04/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 09/10/1954 | 06/11/1954 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22236 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/09/1956 | 15/09/1956 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 19/09/1956 | 22/09/1956 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 26/04/1958 | 24/05/1958 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22262 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/08/1959 | 08/08/1959 | 6 days | Unclassified | Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2162 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22252 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
21/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1927. Dep: 20/08/1927. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6641 |
||
18/08/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
18/08/1927 | To Stock | To ROD stock | ||
28/09/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
04/12/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
26/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1930. Dep: 24/05/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1030 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1931. Dep: 07/11/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1353 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1934. Dep: 14/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 820 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1936. Dep: 19/09/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 803 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
19/06/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
04/03/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1939. Dep: 11/03/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3362 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1941. Dep: 07/06/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3241 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1943. Dep: 31/07/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3248 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/05/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
25/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1945. Dep: 08/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3402 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/04/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
18/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3900 | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
16/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1947. Dep: 06/09/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3387 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1950. Dep: 25/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63900 |
||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
02/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
29/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
12/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1952. Dep: 26/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22119 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/04/1952. Dep: 30/04/1952. | ||
09/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1954. Dep: 06/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22236 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/09/1956. Dep: 15/09/1956. | ||
19/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/09/1956. Dep: 22/09/1956. | ||
26/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1958. Dep: 24/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22262 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/08/1959. Dep: 08/08/1959. Work undertaken: Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
||
10/04/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
23/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63900 from Colwick (40E) |