|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 02/02/1924 | 16/02/1924 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6312 |
||
Gorton Works | 17/05/1924 | 19/07/1924 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 1374 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/12/1926 | 12/02/1927 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/08/1929 | 19/10/1929 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1154 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/06/1931 | 18/07/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1478 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/09/1933 | 07/10/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1161 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/08/1935 | 21/09/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 819 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/09/1937 | 09/10/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1080 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/06/1939 | 01/07/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3374 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/09/1941 | 11/10/1941 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 940 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 778 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1636 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3756 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
02/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1924. Dep: 16/02/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6312 |
||
16/02/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
23/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
17/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1924. Dep: 19/07/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1374 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1926. Dep: 12/02/1927. | ||
03/03/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
04/03/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
14/03/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
07/04/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
24/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1929. Dep: 19/10/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1154 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1931. Dep: 18/07/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1478 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1933. Dep: 07/10/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1161 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1935. Dep: 21/09/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 819 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1937. Dep: 09/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1080 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1939. Dep: 01/07/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3374 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1941. Dep: 11/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 940 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 778 |
||
11/10/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 778 from Woodford Halse (WFD) |