Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 81 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 81 Week
» 11226 Month
» 111011 Year
» 1776387 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1638 m/e 07/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6330   05/07/1924
War Dept. 744   19/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E109
Works Number 3757
To Service During 07/1919
Taken into Stock 05/07/1924
Withdrawal Fri 19/09/1941 off Gorton (GOR)
Service Life 22 yrs, 2 mths , 20 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Renumbered 744 and sent to the Middle East via Swansea, 15/10/41

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1919
GOR   Gorton on 03/07/1924
     Withdrawn on 19/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1162)
04/10/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1026)
30/07/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1340)
19/05/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1310)
13/06/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3244)
13/06/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
28/01/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3215)
20/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3273)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 05/04/1924 05/07/1924 92 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6330
 
Gorton Works 20/11/1926 15/01/1927 57 days General    
Gorton Works 09/06/1928 14/07/1928 36 days General    
Gorton Works 30/08/1930 04/10/1930 36 days General Boiler number 1026 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/07/1932 30/07/1932 22 days General Boiler number 1340 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/05/1934 19/05/1934 8 days General Boiler number 1310 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/07/1934 14/07/1934 8 days Light Repair After collision
 
Gorton Works 30/05/1936 13/06/1936 15 days General Boiler number 3244 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 07/01/1939 28/01/1939 22 days General Boiler number 3215 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1941 20/09/1941 13 days General Boiler number 3273 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 744
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1638
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3757
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
05/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1924. Dep: 05/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6330
   
03/07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
05/07/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
20/11/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1926. Dep: 15/01/1927.    
09/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1928. Dep: 14/07/1928.    
30/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1930. Dep: 04/10/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1026 (Diagram 15)
   
09/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1932. Dep: 30/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1340 (Diagram 15)
   
12/05/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1934. Dep: 19/05/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1310 (Diagram 15)
   
07/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/07/1934. Dep: 14/07/1934.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
30/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1936. Dep: 13/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3244 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
07/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1939. Dep: 28/01/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3215 (Diagram 15)
   
08/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3273 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 744
   
19/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 744 from Gorton (GOR)    

prev prev