Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 512 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6123 Week
» 17169 Month
» 17169 Year
» 1682545 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1640 m/e 08/1919
London and North Western Railway 2831 m/e 09/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6329   22/03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3724   08/09/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E3724   14/02/1948
British Railways 63724 w/e 04/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E109
Works Number 3758
To Service During 08/1919
Taken into Stock 22/03/1924
Withdrawal Wed 08/08/1962
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 43 yrs , 8 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 10/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1919
91LNWR (on loan)   09/1919
ROD     08/1921
GOR Gorton on 29/03/1924
IMM Immingham on 12/04/1924
LNG Langwith Junction on 27/01/1926
IMM Immingham on 06/02/1926
MAR March on 08/09/1944
CAM Cambridge on 22/12/1947
MAR March on 29/03/1948
40E Langwith Junction on 12/02/1950
31B March on 09/03/1952
40E Langwith Junction on 30/03/1952
40D Tuxford on 16/11/1952
37A Ardsley on 27/09/1953
   Withdrawn on 08/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 27/12/1947
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 18/02/1950
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 19/04/1952
ALLOC 40D Tuxford 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   on 08/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1959)
12/04/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1463)
28/05/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1113)
30/06/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1889)
27/03/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3279)
06/05/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3368)
03/05/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3352)
04/09/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1852)
04/06/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3225)
20/10/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22220)
13/03/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22186)
22/03/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22153)
28/01/1961 Water Treatment apparatus fitted


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 02/02/1924 22/03/1924 50 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6329
 
Gorton Works 25/07/1925 19/09/1925 57 days General  
Gorton Works 10/09/1927 22/10/1927 43 days General  
Gorton Works 22/02/1930 12/04/1930 50 days General
Boiler number 1463 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/05/1932 28/05/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1113 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1934 30/06/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1889 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1937 27/03/1937 8 days General
Boiler number 3279 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/04/1939 06/05/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3368 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/04/1941 03/05/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 3352 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/08/1943 04/09/1943 15 days General
Boiler number 1852 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1946 11/01/1947 76 days Heavy  
Gorton Works 07/02/1948 14/02/1948 8 days Light Repair
Tender only
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3724
 
Gorton Works 14/05/1949 04/06/1949 22 days General
Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63724
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1951 20/10/1951 8 days General
Boiler number 22220 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/10/1951 27/10/1951 5 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 13/02/1954 13/03/1954 29 days General
Boiler number 22186 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/03/1954 16/03/1954 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 17/03/1954 20/03/1954 4 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 27/04/1957 18/05/1957 22 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 22/02/1958 22/03/1958 29 days General
Boiler number 22153 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/12/1960 28/01/1961 43 days Light Intermediate
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 Cowlairs Works The following locos. have recently been fitted with new Cowlairs boilers: Nos. 4499 (1932 of 4/44), 4589 (1885 of 11/41), 4594 (1934 of 5/44), 4599 (1929 of 4/44), 4609 (1951 of 12/44), 5221 (1920 of 12/43), 6329 (1926 of 1/44). All the foregoing are fitted with Pop safety valves and L.N.E.R. type fire doors. No. 4549 (1953 of 4/45) is fitted with a L.N.E. firedoor, and No. 7479 (1990 01/11/46) with a N.B. type firedoor. Nos. 5221, 5329 and 7479 have only one steam pipe in the smokebox, instead of the usual two. No. 4477 has been fitted with a Mark II. graduated brake, whist Nos. 5247 and 5339 have the Mark III. pattern. No. 4795 was fitted with American type injectors in July, 1946. SLS/194702
28/05/1961 Swindon Works (Triangle) Gas Works: 4203, 5103/10/76, 9414. Stock Shed Yard: D817, D6319/21, 5815. Triangle: 1361/2/4, 1433, 1647, 3657/67/70/7, 3724, 5001, 6027, 6959, 8457, 8705, 9762. Works Yard: D804/38, D2144/88/91/6, D7000, 1029, 1501/2/9, 1604, 2516, 2884, 4090, 4950/72/8/85, 5022/97, 5949/58, 6004, 6937/62, 7007, 7221, 7304/40, 7761/75, 9400, 9749, 82031, 92226/45. Weigh House: D808, 4984. 'A' Shop: D602, D801/15/8/36/40/3/50/69/70, D1000-7, D2195/7-9, D2372-4, D3257, D6305/9, 3817, 4088, 4264/75, 4704, 4912/4/42/70/88/94, 5015/51/70/2/99, 5914/48/51/3/70/87, 6020, 6333/72, 6828/44/50, 6911/69/77/9, 7002/9/32/6, 7232/3, 13187, 13256/62, 15100/2, 82020/1, 92234. Dump: 1366, 1419/31/54/73, 2207/27, 3676, 5158/75/94, 5771/91, 6426, 7748, 8429, 8722/6/40/69/77, 9735/81. 'C' Shop: 5207, 8101. Field: 78001/8. SLS/196107
17/09/1961 Swindon Works (Triangle) 'A' Shop: D604, D816/7/21/3/5/43/70, D3431, D6306/8/21, 2866, 3852, 4003/79/81/7/9, D1000-11, D2379-83, 4117, 4707, 4904/26/33/43/66/79/92/8, 5018/38/74/92, 5208, 5380, 6021/6, 6808/16/25/32/4/40, 6948, 7018/28, 7219, 7825, 7905/21, 13115/84/6, 13259/65, 92215/26. Works Sidings: D820, D2086, D2143/4, D2378, D7000, 1009, 3670, 3839/59, 4100, 4917/8/83, 5000/78, 5951/98, 6014/6/9/27, 6964/87/96, 7200, 7756/75, 7909, 8721, 9400, 9749, 73027, 78008, 92241/5. Triangle: 1640, 5087, 5198, 5516, 5934/75, 8762/72/87, 9751, 13355. Dump: 1361/6, 1433, 1604, 5318, 6720, 7745/98, 8429, 8740/74/7/89, 9735/6/67. 'C' Shop: 4203, 5110/95. Outside Stock Shed: D806, D4025, D6303, 4948, 5815, 6900. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: D801. Gasworks : Nil. SLS/196111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1640
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3758
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2831    
08/1921 Allocation      
22/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
29/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
12/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
27/01/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
06/02/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
08/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
08/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3724    
22/12/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
29/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
12/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
09/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
30/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
16/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (40D)    
27/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
08/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63724    

prev prev