|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 02/02/1924 | 22/03/1924 | 50 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6329 |
||
Gorton Works | 25/07/1925 | 19/09/1925 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/09/1927 | 22/10/1927 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1930 | 12/04/1930 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1463 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1932 | 28/05/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1113 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/06/1934 | 30/06/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1889 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/03/1937 | 27/03/1937 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3279 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/04/1939 | 06/05/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3368 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/04/1941 | 03/05/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3352 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/08/1943 | 04/09/1943 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1852 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1946 | 11/01/1947 | 76 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 07/02/1948 | 14/02/1948 | 8 days | Light Repair | Tender only Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3724 |
||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1949 | 04/06/1949 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63724 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1951 | 20/10/1951 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 22220 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/10/1951 | 27/10/1951 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 13/02/1954 | 13/03/1954 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22186 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/03/1954 | 16/03/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1954 | 20/03/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 27/04/1957 | 18/05/1957 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1958 | 22/03/1958 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22153 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/12/1960 | 28/01/1961 | 43 days | Light Intermediate | Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | Cowlairs Works | The following locos. have recently been fitted with new Cowlairs boilers: Nos. 4499 (1932 of 4/44), 4589 (1885 of 11/41), 4594 (1934 of 5/44), 4599 (1929 of 4/44), 4609 (1951 of 12/44), 5221 (1920 of 12/43), 6329 (1926 of 1/44). All the foregoing are fitted with Pop safety valves and L.N.E.R. type fire doors. No. 4549 (1953 of 4/45) is fitted with a L.N.E. firedoor, and No. 7479 (1990 01/11/46) with a N.B. type firedoor. Nos. 5221, 5329 and 7479 have only one steam pipe in the smokebox, instead of the usual two. No. 4477 has been fitted with a Mark II. graduated brake, whist Nos. 5247 and 5339 have the Mark III. pattern. No. 4795 was fitted with American type injectors in July, 1946. | SLS/194702 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1640 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3758 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2831 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
02/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1924. Dep: 22/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6329 |
||
22/03/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
29/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
12/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
25/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1925. Dep: 19/09/1925. | ||
27/01/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
06/02/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
10/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1927. Dep: 22/10/1927. | ||
22/02/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1930. Dep: 12/04/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1463 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1932. Dep: 28/05/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1113 (Diagram 15) |
||
16/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1934. Dep: 30/06/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1889 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1937. Dep: 27/03/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3279 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1939. Dep: 06/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3368 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1941. Dep: 03/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3352 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1943. Dep: 04/09/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1852 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
08/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3724 | ||
28/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 28/10/1946. Dep: 11/01/1947. | ||
22/12/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
07/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/02/1948. Dep: 14/02/1948. Work undertaken: Tender only Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3724 |
||
29/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
03/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
14/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1949. Dep: 04/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63724 |
||
12/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
18/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
13/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1951. Dep: 20/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22220 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/10/1951. Dep: 27/10/1951. | ||
09/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
22/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
30/03/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
19/04/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
16/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
29/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
27/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
13/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1954. Dep: 13/03/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22186 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/03/1954. Dep: 16/03/1954. | ||
17/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/03/1954. Dep: 20/03/1954. | ||
27/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/04/1957. Dep: 18/05/1957. | ||
22/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1958. Dep: 22/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22153 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 17/12/1960. Dep: 28/01/1961. Work undertaken: Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
||
08/08/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63724 |