|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 21/02/1924 | 13/08/1924 | 175 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6328 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 22/04/1926 | 16/09/1926 | 148 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/11/1928 | 11/01/1929 | 67 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/06/1929 | 11/07/1929 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/08/1929 | 17/09/1929 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/02/1931 | 25/04/1931 | 72 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/04/1935 | 25/05/1935 | 46 days | General | Boiler number C1472 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/10/1937 | 16/10/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1102 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1940 | 14/12/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3413 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/07/1943 | 24/07/1943 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 3257 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/12/1944 | 31/03/1945 | 92 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5031 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/05/1947 | 24/05/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 5081 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/08/1949 | 20/08/1949 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 5009 (Diagram 100A) Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted Renumbered to BR 63725 |
||
Gorton Works | 03/11/1951 | 01/12/1951 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28363 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/11/1952 | 27/12/1952 | 36 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 28/11/1953 | 19/12/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28351 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/12/1954 | 22/01/1955 | 36 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 28/01/1956 | 25/02/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28316 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/08/1958 | 27/09/1958 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28289 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/01/1959 | 07/02/1959 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 19/12/1959 | 16/01/1960 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/06/1962 | 30/08/1962 | 73 days | General | Boiler number 28300 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1641 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3759 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2832 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
21/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1924. Dep: 13/08/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6328 |
||
13/08/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
22/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1926. Dep: 16/09/1926. | ||
06/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1928. Dep: 11/01/1929. | ||
27/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/06/1929. Dep: 11/07/1929. | ||
28/08/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/08/1929. Dep: 17/09/1929. | ||
13/02/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1931. Dep: 25/04/1931. | ||
10/04/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1935. Dep: 25/05/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1472 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1937. Dep: 16/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1102 (Diagram 15) |
||
30/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/11/1940. Dep: 14/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3413 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1943. Dep: 24/07/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3257 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
30/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1944. Dep: 31/03/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5031 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/04/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
09/06/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3725 | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
03/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1947. Dep: 24/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5081 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1949. Dep: 20/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5009 (Diagram 100A) Self Cleaning Smokebox fitted Renumbered to BR 63725 |
||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
03/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1951. Dep: 01/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28363 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/11/1952. Dep: 27/12/1952. | ||
28/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1953. Dep: 19/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28351 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/12/1954. Dep: 22/01/1955. | ||
28/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1956. Dep: 25/02/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28316 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/07/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) | ||
16/12/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
24/02/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
30/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1958. Dep: 27/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28289 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/01/1959. Dep: 07/02/1959. | ||
19/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/12/1959. Dep: 16/01/1960. | ||
19/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1962. Dep: 30/08/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28300 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
13/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) | ||
11/07/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63725 from Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) | ||
04/10/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |