Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 50 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2976 Week
» 4714 Month
» 132157 Year
» 1797533 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1738 m/e 10/1919
London and North Western Railway 2977 m/e 06/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6327   07/06/1924
War Dept. 788   18/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E109
Works Number 3765
To Service During 10/1919
Taken into Stock 07/06/1924
Withdrawal Sat 18/10/1941 off March (MAR)
Service Life 22 yrs , 18 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Renumbered 788 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1919
91LNWR   (on loan)   06/1920
GOR   Gorton on 07/06/1924
MAR   March on 17/10/1935
     Withdrawn on 18/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1276)
27/06/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1279)
14/10/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1007)
31/08/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 854)
04/09/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1955)
16/12/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3203)
18/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3295)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 05/04/1924 07/06/1924 64 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6327
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1926 12/02/1927 44 days General    
Gorton Works 27/04/1929 08/06/1929 43 days General    
Gorton Works 06/06/1931 27/06/1931 22 days General Boiler number 1279 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/09/1933 14/10/1933 22 days General Boiler number 1007 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1935 31/08/1935 15 days General Boiler number 854 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1937 04/09/1937 22 days General Boiler number 1955 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1939 16/12/1939 22 days General Boiler number 3203 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1941 18/10/1941 18 days General Boiler number 3295 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 788
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1738
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3765
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
06/1920 Allocation      
06/1920 Renumbered Renumbered to 2977    
05/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1924. Dep: 07/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6327
   
07/06/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
07/06/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
31/12/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1926. Dep: 12/02/1927.    
27/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1929. Dep: 08/06/1929.    
06/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1931. Dep: 27/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1279 (Diagram 15)
   
23/09/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/09/1933. Dep: 14/10/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1007 (Diagram 15)
   
17/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1935. Dep: 31/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 854 (Diagram 15)
   
17/10/1935 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
14/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1937. Dep: 04/09/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1955 (Diagram 15)
   
25/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1939. Dep: 16/12/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3203 (Diagram 15)
   
01/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1941. Dep: 18/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3295 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 788
   
18/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 788 from March (MAR)    

prev prev