Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 41 Today
» 753 Yesterday
» 2839 Week
» 14521 Month
» 167474 Year
» 1832850 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1743 m/e 11/1919
London and North Western Railway 2961 m/e 06/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6326   12/04/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3730   08/09/1946
British Railways 63730 5w/e 26/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/311/1919
O4/8 (2-8-0)15/03/1958
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E109
Works Number 3770
To Service During 11/1919
Taken into Stock 12/04/1924
Withdrawal Sun 02/01/1966 off Doncaster (36A)
Service Life 46 yrs, 2 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Beighton, 2/66

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1919
91LNWR   (on loan)   06/1920
GOR   Gorton on 10/04/1924
LNG   Langwith Junction on 14/05/1924
MAR   March on 07/09/1944
CAM   Cambridge on 22/12/1947
MAR   March on 29/03/1948
MAR   March w/e 03/04/1948
36B   Mexborough on 28/10/1951
36B   Mexborough w/e 03/11/1951
36C   Frodingham on 27/12/1959
36E   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 20/11/1960
36A   Doncaster on 03/03/1963
     Withdrawn on 02/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 27/12/1947
ALLOC MAR March w/e 03/04/1948
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 23/01/1960
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 5w/e 06/04/1963
WDN   w/e 02/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1957)
22/05/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1170)
12/04/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1310)
05/06/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1189)
05/08/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1485)
18/08/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1090)
18/08/1934 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
18/08/1934 Intensifore lubricator removed
26/09/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3262)
19/11/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3253)
29/03/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 512)
04/09/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 804)
25/08/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1130)
10/11/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22126)
31/10/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22172)
15/03/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28393)
19/04/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28923)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 23/02/1924 12/04/1924 50 days Heavy Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6326
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1926 22/05/1926 60 days General Boiler number 1170 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/02/1928 12/04/1928 60 days General Boiler number 1310 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/04/1930 05/06/1930 48 days General Boiler number 1189 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/06/1932 05/08/1932 38 days General Boiler number 1485 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/07/1934 18/08/1934 27 days General Boiler number 1090 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 25/08/1936 26/09/1936 33 days General Boiler number 3262 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1938 19/11/1938 64 days General Boiler number 3253 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/02/1941 29/03/1941 38 days General Boiler number 512 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1943 04/09/1943 24 days General Boiler number 804 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1947 25/08/1947 155 days General Boiler number 1130 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/12/1948 05/02/1949 40 days Light Repair Renumbered to BR 63730
 
Gorton Works 10/10/1950 10/11/1950 32 days General Boiler number 22126 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/10/1953 31/10/1953 27 days General Boiler number 22172 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/01/1958 15/03/1958 47 days General Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28393 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1962 19/04/1962 42 days General Boiler number 28923 (Diagram 100A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
18/03/1962 Gorton Works (Outside Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: E26011/34, E27005, 63689, 63720/81, 90013/101/30/3/280/300/1/2, 90447/84, 90541/611/65/730, 92014/92/102. Outside Erecting Shop: E26000/26/33/47, 64744, 63612, 63730/62, 63775, 90103. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1743
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3770
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
06/1920 Allocation      
06/1920 Renumbered Renumbered to 2961    
23/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/02/1924. Dep: 12/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6326
   
10/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
12/04/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
14/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
24/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1926. Dep: 22/05/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1170 (Diagram 15)
   
13/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1928. Dep: 12/04/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1310 (Diagram 15)
   
19/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1930. Dep: 05/06/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1189 (Diagram 15)
   
29/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1932. Dep: 05/08/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1485 (Diagram 15)
   
23/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1934. Dep: 18/08/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1090 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
25/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1936. Dep: 26/09/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3262 (Diagram 15)
   
17/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1938. Dep: 19/11/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3253 (Diagram 15)
   
20/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1941. Dep: 29/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 512 (Diagram 15)
   
12/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1943. Dep: 04/09/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 804 (Diagram 15)
   
07/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
08/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3730    
24/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1947. Dep: 25/08/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1130 (Diagram 15)
   
22/12/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
29/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
03/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
28/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/12/1948. Dep: 05/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63730
   
10/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1950. Dep: 10/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22126 (Diagram 15)
   
28/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
03/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
05/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1953. Dep: 31/10/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22172 (Diagram 15)
   
28/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1958. Dep: 15/03/1958.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28393 (Diagram 100A)
   
27/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
20/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
09/03/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1962. Dep: 19/04/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28923 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
02/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 63730 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev