|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 23/02/1924 | 12/04/1924 | 50 days | Heavy | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6326 |
||
Gorton Works | 24/03/1926 | 22/05/1926 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 1170 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/02/1928 | 12/04/1928 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 1310 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/04/1930 | 05/06/1930 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 1189 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/06/1932 | 05/08/1932 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 1485 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/07/1934 | 18/08/1934 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 1090 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1936 | 26/09/1936 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 3262 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/09/1938 | 19/11/1938 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 3253 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/02/1941 | 29/03/1941 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 512 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/08/1943 | 04/09/1943 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 804 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/03/1947 | 25/08/1947 | 155 days | General | Boiler number 1130 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/12/1948 | 05/02/1949 | 40 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63730 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/10/1950 | 10/11/1950 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 22126 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/10/1953 | 31/10/1953 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 22172 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/01/1958 | 15/03/1958 | 47 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28393 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/03/1962 | 19/04/1962 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 28923 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
18/03/1962 | Gorton Works (Outside Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: E26011/34, E27005, 63689, 63720/81, 90013/101/30/3/280/300/1/2, 90447/84, 90541/611/65/730, 92014/92/102. Outside Erecting Shop: E26000/26/33/47, 64744, 63612, 63730/62, 63775, 90103. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1743 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3770 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
06/1920 | Allocation | |||
06/1920 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2961 | ||
23/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 23/02/1924. Dep: 12/04/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6326 |
||
10/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
12/04/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
14/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
24/03/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1926. Dep: 22/05/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1170 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1928. Dep: 12/04/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1310 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1930. Dep: 05/06/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1189 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1932. Dep: 05/08/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1485 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1934. Dep: 18/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1090 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
25/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1936. Dep: 26/09/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3262 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1938. Dep: 19/11/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3253 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1941. Dep: 29/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 512 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1943. Dep: 04/09/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 804 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
08/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3730 | ||
24/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1947. Dep: 25/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1130 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/12/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
29/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
03/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
28/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/12/1948. Dep: 05/02/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63730 |
||
10/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1950. Dep: 10/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22126 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
03/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
05/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1953. Dep: 31/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22172 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/01/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1958. Dep: 15/03/1958. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28393 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/12/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
20/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
09/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1962. Dep: 19/04/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28923 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
02/01/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63730 from Doncaster (36A) |