|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 09/02/1924 | 16/02/1924 | 8 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6307 |
||
Gorton Works | 15/09/1924 | 15/01/1925 | 123 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/07/1927 | 18/08/1927 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/06/1929 | 29/08/1929 | 83 days | General | Boiler number 1142 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/09/1932 | 28/10/1932 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 1319 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1934 | 22/12/1934 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 1188 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
Gorton Works | 03/08/1936 | 29/08/1936 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 3258 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1938 | 22/10/1938 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/09/1940 | 28/09/1940 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 1275 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 13/11/1942 | 24/01/1943 | 73 days | General | Boiler number 3403 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/01/1945 | 17/03/1945 | 67 days | General | Boiler number 1959 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1946 | 02/11/1946 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 3238 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1948 | 22/01/1949 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 3399 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63731 |
||
Gorton Works | 04/01/1951 | 03/02/1951 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 22158 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/02/1953 | 28/03/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 22145 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1953 | 01/04/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 24/05/1956 | 08/09/1956 | 108 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28920 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/09/1956 | 19/09/1956 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 16/08/1960 | 10/09/1960 | 26 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 03/10/1960 | 08/10/1960 | 6 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1746 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3773 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/02/1924. Dep: 16/02/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6307 |
||
16/02/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
21/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
21/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
15/09/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1924. Dep: 15/01/1925. | ||
14/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1927. Dep: 18/08/1927. | ||
08/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1929. Dep: 29/08/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1142 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1932. Dep: 28/10/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1319 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1934. Dep: 22/12/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1188 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
03/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1936. Dep: 29/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3258 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
20/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1938. Dep: 22/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 930 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1940. Dep: 28/09/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1275 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1942. Dep: 24/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3403 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
10/01/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1945. Dep: 17/03/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1959 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3731 | ||
03/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1946. Dep: 02/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3238 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/11/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
18/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
24/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
06/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1948. Dep: 22/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3399 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63731 |
||
04/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1951. Dep: 03/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22158 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) | ||
06/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) | ||
27/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1953. Dep: 28/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22145 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/03/1953. Dep: 01/04/1953. | ||
24/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1956. Dep: 08/09/1956. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28920 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/09/1956. Dep: 19/09/1956. | ||
29/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
16/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/08/1960. Dep: 10/09/1960. | ||
03/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/10/1960. Dep: 08/10/1960. | ||
29/10/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63731 from Langwith Junction (41J) |