|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 04/04/1925 | 20/06/1925 | 78 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6501 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/08/1927 | 08/10/1927 | 41 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/03/1930 | 20/05/1930 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/06/1932 | 30/07/1932 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 1212 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/07/1934 | 11/08/1934 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 1160 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/12/1936 | 23/01/1937 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 1210 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/05/1939 | 17/06/1939 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3287 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/05/1942 | 06/06/1942 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 3271 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/07/1944 | 19/08/1944 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 1005 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/03/1946 | 04/05/1946 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 3347 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3732 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1948 | 12/06/1948 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 3218 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63732 |
||
Gorton Works | 31/05/1951 | 21/07/1951 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 22197 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/09/1953 | 01/10/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22177 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1956 | 28/07/1956 | 76 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28897 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/08/1958 | 20/09/1958 | 30 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 14/10/1958 | 15/11/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28371 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/03/1962 | 03/05/1962 | 42 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1747 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3774 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
04/04/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1925. Dep: 20/06/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6501 |
||
19/06/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
20/06/1925 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
09/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
29/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1927. Dep: 08/10/1927. | ||
24/09/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
26/11/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
28/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1930. Dep: 20/05/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1932. Dep: 30/07/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1212 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1934. Dep: 11/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1160 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1936. Dep: 23/01/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1210 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1939. Dep: 17/06/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3287 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1942. Dep: 06/06/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3271 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/09/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
31/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1944. Dep: 19/08/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1005 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/01/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
19/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1946. Dep: 04/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3347 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3732 |
||
11/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1948. Dep: 12/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3218 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63732 |
||
11/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
04/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
10/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
31/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1951. Dep: 21/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22197 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
10/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1953. Dep: 01/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22177 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1956. Dep: 28/07/1956. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28897 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/08/1958. Dep: 20/09/1958. | ||
14/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1958. Dep: 15/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28371 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/03/1962. Dep: 03/05/1962. | ||
05/09/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63732 from Langwith Junction (41J) |