|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 13/05/1922 | 01/07/1922 | 50 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/6 Boiler number 1171 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/04/1923 | 25/07/1923 | 89 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/07/1925 | 27/10/1925 | 112 days | General | Boiler number 1452 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5412 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/05/1928 | 03/07/1928 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/08/1930 | 02/10/1930 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 548 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/01/1934 | 17/03/1934 | 46 days | General | Spring gear altered for working to Whitemoor Boiler number 1473 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/10/1936 | 21/11/1936 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1381 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1939 | 06/01/1940 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/12/1942 | 30/01/1943 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 3256 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/12/1945 | 02/03/1946 | 76 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 21/03/1948 | 03/05/1948 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 3404 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63902 |
||
Gorton Works | 21/08/1950 | 23/09/1950 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 22109 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/09/1950 | 29/09/1950 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 08/10/1950 | 11/10/1950 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 17/11/1952 | 06/12/1952 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 22880 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/12/1954 | 12/02/1955 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 22223 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/08/1955 | 08/09/1955 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 11/10/1956 | 10/11/1956 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1957 | 01/06/1957 | 22 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22221 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/05/1958 | 05/07/1958 | 39 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 07/04/1961 | 12/05/1961 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1918 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 412 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15B boiler fitted |
||
13/05/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1922. Dep: 01/07/1922. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/6 Boiler number 1171 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/07/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
28/04/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1923. Dep: 25/07/1923. | ||
09/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
08/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1925. Dep: 27/10/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1452 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5412 |
||
08/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1928. Dep: 03/07/1928. | ||
02/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1930. Dep: 02/10/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 548 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1934. Dep: 17/03/1934. Work undertaken: Spring gear altered for working to Whitemoor Boiler number 1473 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1936. Dep: 21/11/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1381 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
05/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1939. Dep: 06/01/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1968 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1942. Dep: 30/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3256 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1945. Dep: 02/03/1946. | ||
20/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3902 | ||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
04/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
21/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1948. Dep: 03/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3404 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63902 |
||
18/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
24/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
25/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
21/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1950. Dep: 23/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22109 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/09/1950. Dep: 29/09/1950. | ||
08/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/10/1950. Dep: 11/10/1950. | ||
17/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1952. Dep: 06/12/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22880 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1954. Dep: 12/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22223 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/08/1955. Dep: 08/09/1955. | ||
11/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/10/1956. Dep: 10/11/1956. | ||
11/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/05/1957. Dep: 01/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22221 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 28/05/1958. Dep: 05/07/1958. | ||
07/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/04/1961. Dep: 12/05/1961. | ||
11/04/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63902 from Langwith Junction (41J) |