Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 468 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5455 Week
» 13570 Month
» 141013 Year
» 1806389 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 413 m/e 03/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5413   31/01/1925
War Dept. 770   08/11/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O503/1918
O4/6 (2-8-0)01/07/1922
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 555
To Service During 03/1918
Withdrawal Sat 08/11/1941 off Mexborough (MEX)
Service Life 23 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Renumbered 770 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1918
GOR   Gorton on 01/07/1922
MEX   Mexborough on 09/02/1924
     Withdrawn on 08/11/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1918 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number ?)
01/07/1922 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1504)
31/01/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1184)
12/04/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1045)
12/11/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1749)
24/08/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1025)
01/10/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3346)
11/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3280)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 29/04/1922 01/07/1922 64 days General Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 1504 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/11/1924 31/01/1925 78 days General Boiler number 1184 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5413
 
Gorton Works 15/10/1927 26/11/1927 43 days General    
Gorton Works 15/03/1930 12/04/1930 29 days General Boiler number 1045 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/10/1932 12/11/1932 15 days General Boiler number 1749 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/08/1935 24/08/1935 15 days General Boiler number 1025 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1938 01/10/1938 36 days General Boiler number 3346 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1941 11/10/1941 20 days General Boiler number 3280 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1918 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 413
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15B boiler fitted
   
29/04/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1922. Dep: 01/07/1922.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 1504 (Diagram 15)
   
01/07/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
09/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
15/11/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1924. Dep: 31/01/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1184 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5413
   
15/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1927. Dep: 26/11/1927.    
15/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1930. Dep: 12/04/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1045 (Diagram 15)
   
29/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1932. Dep: 12/11/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1749 (Diagram 15)
   
10/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1935. Dep: 24/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1025 (Diagram 15)
   
27/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1938. Dep: 01/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3346 (Diagram 15)
   
22/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1941. Dep: 11/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3280 (Diagram 15)
   
08/11/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 770 from Mexborough (MEX)    
08/11/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 770    

prev prev