Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 81 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 81 Week
» 11226 Month
» 111011 Year
» 1776387 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 414 m/e 04/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5414   22/05/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3904   11/08/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E3904   31/01/1948
British Railways 63904 w/e 05/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O504/1918
O4/6 (2-8-0)14/11/1936
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 555
To Service During 04/1918
Withdrawal Thu 23/11/1961 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Service Life 43 yrs, 7 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1918
RET   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 05/08/1921
MAR   March on 02/11/1941
CAM   Cambridge on 22/12/1947
MEX   Mexborough on 22/05/1949
MEX   Mexborough w/e 28/05/1949
BRN   Barnsley on 21/08/1949
BRN   Barnsley w/e 27/08/1949
41F   Mexborough on 03/01/1960
36E   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 09/07/1961
     Withdrawn on 23/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 27/12/1947
ALLOC MEX Mexborough w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC BRN Barnsley w/e 27/08/1949
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 23/01/1960
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 05/08/1961
WDN   on 23/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1918 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1725)
22/05/1926 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1735)
30/08/1930 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1739)
17/09/1932 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1734)
20/10/1934 Intensifore lubricator removed
14/11/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 547)
04/03/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1236)
01/03/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3210)
04/09/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1344)
02/06/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1291)
31/01/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 927)
23/06/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22193)
30/03/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22270)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 05/02/1921 19/03/1921 43 days General    
Gorton Works 15/09/1923 24/11/1923 71 days General    
Gorton Works 13/03/1926 22/05/1926 71 days General Boiler number 1735 (Diagram 15B)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5414
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1928 21/04/1928 43 days General    
Gorton Works 02/08/1930 30/08/1930 29 days General Boiler number 1739 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 27/08/1932 17/09/1932 22 days General Boiler number 1734 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1934 20/10/1934 22 days General Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 24/10/1936 14/11/1936 22 days General Heating apparatus removed
Boiler number 547 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/02/1939 04/03/1939 22 days General Boiler number 1236 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/02/1941 01/03/1941 15 days General Boiler number 3210 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/10/1941 01/11/1941 6 days Light Repair Dragbox altered for Whitemoor hump
 
Gorton Works 19/08/1943 04/09/1943 17 days General Boiler number 1344 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/05/1945 02/06/1945 22 days Heavy Boiler number 1291 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/08/1945 29/09/1945 39 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 27/12/1947 31/01/1948 36 days General Boiler number 927 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3904
 
Gorton Works 22/10/1949 05/11/1949 15 days Light Casual After collision
Renumbered to BR 63904
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1951 23/06/1951 22 days General Boiler number 22193 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1951 01/07/1951 6 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 03/07/1954 21/08/1954 50 days Heavy Intermediate    
Gorton Works 09/03/1957 30/03/1957 22 days Heavy Casual Boiler number 22270 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1958 26/04/1958 22 days Light Intermediate    
Gorton Works 29/04/1958 06/05/1958 8 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 15/11/1961 15/11/1961 1 day No repairs    

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during September included: Nos. 1000/25, 1430/40/61, 1957/91, 2144/81/88/94, 2224/46/71, 2827/38/42/72/77/82, 2948, 3617, 3861/64/66, 3904/55, 4000/37/44/58/88, 4128, 4280, 4407, 4509/32/37/40/50, 4639, 4704, 4804, 4973/75/78, 5011/57/71/79, 5153/56, 5207, 5369/75, 5510/54/74, 5718/33/61, 5903/34/51/62/69/84, 6005/06/12, 6133, 6337/40/75/93, 6406/30, 6801/47, 6905/16/52/70, 7004/05/17, 7306/09, 7402/22, 7800/18, 8722/37/39, 9612, 9730.
New work; September: Nos. 7435 (-), 7436 (OXF), 7437 (WOS), 7438 (DG) (completed 5/10); 4160 (-). 4161 (BRY), 4162 (-), 4163 (BRY) and 4164 (DYD), nearly completed. Works' pilots have been Nos. 212, 1713, 1900 an 2764.
Outside the Works and awaiting scrapping are the following:-Nos. 1730, 2643/80, 2734/46/51, 3002/06/27, 3165/84, 3440, 5127, 5343/49 an 9006. In addition, Nos. 2709, 2928, 3005 an 3395 came in for scrapping at the beginning of October. All locomotives receiving a general repair (except express passenger locomotives) are now coming out painted plain black with the exception of No. 5156, which was fully lined, but without 'British Railways' on the tank sides. The majority of locomotives are now receiving smokebox number-plates.
No. 7017 was ex. Works on 22/9 after light repairs and is now running without nameplates
SLS/194811
21/10/1948 Swindon Stock Shed (Newburn Wagon Repair) On 21/10 the Stock Shed contained the following:-Nos. 5, 3012/14/15/17/18/23/41, 3900/54/55, 4081, 4502, 4914, 4801/06/08/10/51/55/57, 6320 while those observed at the Newburn Wagon Repair Shed were Nos. 3022/24/36, 3377/83/93, 3406/07/44/47/49, 3450/51/54, 3901/03/52, 4803/05/07/09/11/53/54/56, 9024/83/84/89. Nos. 3904/50 an 4804 have been re-converted to coal-burning and re-numbered *4972, 5955 and 2839 respectively. *Still retains electric lighting equipment. SLS/194812

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1918 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 414
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15B boiler fitted
   
05/02/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1921. Dep: 19/03/1921.    
05/08/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
15/09/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1923. Dep: 24/11/1923.    
13/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1926. Dep: 22/05/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1735 (Diagram 15B)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5414
   
10/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1928. Dep: 21/04/1928.    
02/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1930. Dep: 30/08/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1739 (Diagram 15B)
   
27/08/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1932. Dep: 17/09/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1734 (Diagram 15B)
   
29/09/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1934. Dep: 20/10/1934.
Work undertaken:
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
24/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1936. Dep: 14/11/1936.
Work undertaken:
Heating apparatus removed
Boiler number 547 (Diagram 15)
   
11/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1939. Dep: 04/03/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1236 (Diagram 15)
   
15/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1941. Dep: 01/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3210 (Diagram 15)
   
27/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/10/1941. Dep: 01/11/1941.
Work undertaken:
Dragbox altered for Whitemoor hump
   
02/11/1941 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
19/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1943. Dep: 04/09/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1344 (Diagram 15)
   
12/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/05/1945. Dep: 02/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1291 (Diagram 15)
   
22/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/08/1945. Dep: 29/09/1945.    
11/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3904    
22/12/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
27/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1947. Dep: 31/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 927 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3904
   
22/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
28/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
21/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
27/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
22/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/10/1949. Dep: 05/11/1949.
Work undertaken:
After collision
Renumbered to BR 63904
   
02/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1951. Dep: 23/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22193 (Diagram 15)
   
26/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/06/1951. Dep: 01/07/1951.    
03/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/07/1954. Dep: 21/08/1954.    
09/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 09/03/1957. Dep: 30/03/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22270 (Diagram 15)
   
05/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 05/04/1958. Dep: 26/04/1958.    
29/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/04/1958. Dep: 06/05/1958.    
03/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
09/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
15/11/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 15/11/1961. Dep: 15/11/1961.    
23/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 63904 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev