|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/01/1921 | 12/03/1921 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1923 | 29/09/1923 | 92 days | G, | Boiler number 1735 (Diagram 15B) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/07/1925 | 19/12/1925 | 162 days | General | Boiler number 1789 (Diagram 15B) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5415 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/04/1928 | 02/06/1928 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 04/10/1930 | 01/11/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1719 (Diagram 15B) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/10/1932 | 19/11/1932 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/07/1934 | 04/08/1934 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1792 (Diagram 15B) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/09/1936 | 10/10/1936 | 22 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/6 Boiler number 1059 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
Gorton Works | 10/12/1938 | 31/12/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1947 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/12/1940 | 11/01/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1102 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1943 | 06/03/1943 | 18 days | General | Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/05/1945 | 02/06/1945 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/06/1947 | 05/07/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3366 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/09/1949 | 24/09/1949 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63905 |
||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1952 | 08/03/1952 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22249 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/03/1952 | 13/03/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 13/02/1954 | 27/02/1954 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22217 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/03/1954 | 19/03/1954 | 18 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1956 | 01/09/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22211 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/04/1959 | 01/04/1959 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1918 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 415 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15B boiler fitted |
||
22/01/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1921. Dep: 12/03/1921. | ||
05/08/1921 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
30/06/1923 | Works Visit | |||
11/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1925. Dep: 19/12/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1789 (Diagram 15B) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5415 |
||
28/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1928. Dep: 02/06/1928. | ||
04/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1930. Dep: 01/11/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1719 (Diagram 15B) |
||
22/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1932. Dep: 19/11/1932. | ||
28/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1934. Dep: 04/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1792 (Diagram 15B) |
||
19/09/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1936. Dep: 10/10/1936. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/6 Boiler number 1059 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
10/12/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1938. Dep: 31/12/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1947 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
28/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1940. Dep: 11/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1102 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/02/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1943. Dep: 06/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3225 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1945. Dep: 02/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3905 | ||
14/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1947. Dep: 05/07/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3366 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1949. Dep: 24/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63905 |
||
23/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1952. Dep: 08/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22249 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/03/1952. Dep: 13/03/1952. | ||
13/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1954. Dep: 27/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22217 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/03/1954. Dep: 19/03/1954. | ||
04/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1956. Dep: 01/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22211 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 01/04/1959. Dep: 01/04/1959. | ||
08/04/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63905 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |