Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 2 Today
» 929 Yesterday
» 1839 Week
» 12984 Month
» 112769 Year
» 1778145 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 417 m/e 06/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5417   21/01/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3906   28/10/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E3906   21/02/1948
British Railways 63906 w/e 19/08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O506/1918
O4/6 (2-8-0)20/02/1937
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 555
To Service During 06/1918
Withdrawal Sun 03/01/1965 off Frodingham (36C)
Service Life 46 yrs, 7 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Mon 05/04/1965 at Drapers (Hull)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to A Draper, Hull, 2/65. Cut up 5/4/65

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1918
MEX   Mexborough on 20/09/1919
FRO   Frodingham on 25/12/1949
FRO   Frodingham w/e 31/12/1949
     Withdrawn on 03/01/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FRO Frodingham w/e 31/12/1949
WDN   on 03/01/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1918 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1735)
30/07/1923 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1790)
21/01/1926 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1788)
11/04/1929 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 11)
25/08/1931 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1791)
31/05/1934 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 13)
20/02/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1267)
20/02/1937 Intensifore lubricator removed
04/05/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3395)
17/04/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 825)
29/09/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3334)
21/02/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3403)
29/07/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1118)
30/08/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22289)
12/02/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22298)
16/11/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22224)
18/05/1961 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22264)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 12/03/1921 25/07/1921 136 days General    
Gorton Works 26/05/1923 30/07/1923 66 days General Boiler number 1790 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 22/08/1925 21/01/1926 153 days General Boiler number 1788 (Diagram 15B)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5417
 
Gorton Works 10/11/1927 10/01/1928 62 days General    
Gorton Works 21/02/1929 11/04/1929 50 days General Boiler number 11 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 18/07/1931 25/08/1931 39 days General Boiler number 1791 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 25/04/1934 31/05/1934 37 days General Boiler number 13 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 17/01/1937 20/02/1937 35 days General Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 1267 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 06/04/1940 04/05/1940 29 days General Boiler number 3395 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1943 17/04/1943 53 days General Boiler number 825 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1945 29/09/1945 47 days General Boiler number 3334 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/01/1948 21/02/1948 28 days General Boiler number 3403 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3906
 
Gorton Works 08/06/1950 29/07/1950 52 days General Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63906
 
Gorton Works 07/08/1952 30/08/1952 24 days General Boiler number 22289 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/12/1954 12/02/1955 60 days General Boiler number 22298 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1957 16/11/1957 57 days General Boiler number 22224 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1959 26/06/1959 23 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 18/04/1961 18/05/1961 31 days General Boiler number 22264 (Diagram 15)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/01/1965 Doncaster MPD (Awaiting works or stored) Awaiting works or stored: 60114/128/157/8, 62037/40/51/5, 63906, 90302/469, 92169/70/5. SLS/196502
23/01/1965 Doncaster MPD (Waiting works or stored) Waiting works or stored: 60114/28/57/8, 61212, 62020/33/7/40/51/5/66, 63606/728/906, 90042/469, 92169/70/5/92/8/9. SLS/196503
07/03/1965 Doncaster MPD (Awaiting sale for scrap) Awaiting sale for scrap: 62051, 63906, 90042/119, 92192. SLS/196504
04/04/1965 Doncaster Works (Stored) Erecting shop: D1522, D1776, D2039, D2554, D2958, D3159, D3327, D3650, D3689, D4073, D5051/580/607/48, D5809/49/50/61, D6716/48; Outside: D5557/95, D5623, D6733, D8233; Stripping shop: D5588, D5632/52/4/80 also D3444, D5615, D9009 an D4066; New Erecting shop: E3111-3120, D5532, D8228, D9001; Paint shop and area: E3102/8/9/10/21/2, D3701, D5557/95, D5623/84, D6729/33, D6973/4/5, D8233; Stored: 63906, 90042/70/119/647, 92192. SLS/196505

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1918 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 417
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15B boiler fitted
   
20/09/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
12/03/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1921. Dep: 25/07/1921.    
26/05/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1923. Dep: 30/07/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1790 (Diagram 15B)
   
22/08/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1925. Dep: 21/01/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1788 (Diagram 15B)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5417
   
10/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1927. Dep: 10/01/1928.    
21/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1929. Dep: 11/04/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 11 (Diagram 15B)
   
18/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1931. Dep: 25/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1791 (Diagram 15B)
   
25/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1934. Dep: 31/05/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 13 (Diagram 15B)
   
17/01/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1937. Dep: 20/02/1937.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 1267 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
06/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1940. Dep: 04/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3395 (Diagram 15)
   
24/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1943. Dep: 17/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 825 (Diagram 15)
   
14/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1945. Dep: 29/09/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3334 (Diagram 15)
   
28/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3906    
25/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1948. Dep: 21/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3403 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3906
   
25/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
31/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
08/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1950. Dep: 29/07/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1118 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63906
   
07/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/08/1952. Dep: 30/08/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22289 (Diagram 15)
   
15/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1954. Dep: 12/02/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22298 (Diagram 15)
   
21/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1957. Dep: 16/11/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22224 (Diagram 15)
   
04/06/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/06/1959. Dep: 26/06/1959.    
18/04/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1961. Dep: 18/05/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22264 (Diagram 15)
   
03/01/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63906 from Frodingham (36C)    
05/04/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev