Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 56 Today
» 904 Yesterday
» 5587 Week
» 7325 Month
» 134768 Year
» 1800144 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 422 m/e 06/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5422   07/02/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3911   15/09/1946
British Railways 63911 w/e 10/12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O506/1919
O4/6 (2-8-0)23/01/1943
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 622
To Service During 06/1919
Withdrawal Sun 09/12/1962 off Mexborough (41F)
Service Life 43 yrs, 6 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)

Notes
Notes Fitted with pulveriser when new
Sold for scrap to Round Oak Steel, Brierly Hill, 3/64

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1919
GOR   Gorton on 28/06/1919
MEX   Mexborough on 09/02/1924
DON   Doncaster on 18/08/1946
FRO   Frodingham on 18/01/1948
FRO   Frodingham w/e 24/01/1948
36D   Barnsley on 13/11/1955
41F   Mexborough on 03/01/1960
     Withdrawn on 09/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FRO Frodingham w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC 36D Barnsley 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 23/01/1960
WDN   on 09/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1739)
08/10/1927 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1791)
27/06/1931 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1792)
23/06/1934 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1791)
06/03/1937 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 873)
06/03/1937 Intensifore lubricator removed
23/01/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3275)
03/03/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1190)
09/08/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3264)
10/12/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3382)
24/05/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22128)
23/10/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22257)
11/01/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22162)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 28/08/1920 04/09/1920 8 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 20/01/1923 10/03/1923 50 days General Pulveriser removed
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1924 07/02/1925 64 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5422
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1927 08/10/1927 50 days General Boiler number 1791 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 16/03/1929 20/04/1929 36 days General    
Gorton Works 06/06/1931 27/06/1931 22 days General Boiler number 1792 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1934 23/06/1934 15 days General Boiler number 1791 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 20/02/1937 06/03/1937 15 days General Boiler number 873 (Diagram 15B)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 23/12/1939 13/01/1940 22 days General    
Gorton Works 05/01/1943 23/01/1943 19 days General Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 3275 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1945 03/03/1945 22 days General Boiler number 1190 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/06/1947 09/08/1947 43 days General Boiler number 3264 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/11/1949 10/12/1949 22 days General Boiler number 22148 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63911
 
Gorton Works 16/12/1950 30/12/1950 15 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 03/01/1951 04/01/1951 2 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 26/04/1952 24/05/1952 29 days General Boiler number 22128 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1952 28/05/1952 2 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 25/09/1954 23/10/1954 29 days General Boiler number 22257 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/12/1957 11/01/1958 36 days General Boiler number 22162 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1958 12/04/1958 8 days Light Casual After collision
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 422
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15B boiler fitted
   
28/06/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
28/08/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/08/1920. Dep: 04/09/1920.    
20/01/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1923. Dep: 10/03/1923.
Work undertaken:
Pulveriser removed
   
09/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
06/12/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1924. Dep: 07/02/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5422
   
20/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1927. Dep: 08/10/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1791 (Diagram 15B)
   
16/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1929. Dep: 20/04/1929.    
06/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1931. Dep: 27/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1792 (Diagram 15B)
   
09/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1934. Dep: 23/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1791 (Diagram 15B)
   
20/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1937. Dep: 06/03/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 873 (Diagram 15B)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
23/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1939. Dep: 13/01/1940.    
05/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1943. Dep: 23/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 3275 (Diagram 15)
   
10/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1945. Dep: 03/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1190 (Diagram 15)
   
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
15/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3911    
28/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1947. Dep: 09/08/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3264 (Diagram 15)
   
18/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
24/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
19/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1949. Dep: 10/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22148 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63911
   
16/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/12/1950. Dep: 30/12/1950.    
03/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/01/1951. Dep: 04/01/1951.    
26/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1952. Dep: 24/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22128 (Diagram 15)
   
27/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/05/1952. Dep: 28/05/1952.    
25/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1954. Dep: 23/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22257 (Diagram 15)
   
13/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (36D)    
07/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1957. Dep: 11/01/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22162 (Diagram 15)
   
05/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/04/1958. Dep: 12/04/1958.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
03/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
09/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63911 from Mexborough (41F)    

prev prev