|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/01/1921 | 05/03/1921 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1923 | 14/04/1923 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/01/1925 | 28/02/1925 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 5 (Diagram 15B) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5010 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/10/1927 | 05/11/1927 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1739 (Diagram 15B) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/10/1929 | 02/11/1929 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1792 (Diagram 15B) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/01/1931 | 21/02/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 13 (Diagram 15B) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/08/1933 | 16/09/1933 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 1736 (Diagram 15B) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/05/1936 | 13/06/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1 (Diagram 15B) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
Gorton Works | 08/10/1938 | 05/11/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 64 (Diagram 15B) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/07/1941 | 26/07/1941 | 13 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/6 Boiler number 3325 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/12/1943 | 18/12/1943 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1023 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/09/1946 | 12/10/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3274 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/02/1949 | 05/03/1949 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3413 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63912 |
||
Gorton Works | 07/04/1951 | 21/04/1951 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22178 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/04/1951 | 27/04/1951 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 29/11/1952 | 10/01/1953 | 43 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 01/08/1953 | 15/08/1953 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22137 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/08/1953 | 25/08/1953 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 25/02/1956 | 24/03/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22893 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/05/1959 | 06/06/1959 | 29 days | General | Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1919 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 10 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15B boiler fitted |
||
17/10/1919 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
22/01/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1921. Dep: 05/03/1921. | ||
10/02/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1923. Dep: 14/04/1923. | ||
17/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1925. Dep: 28/02/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5 (Diagram 15B) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5010 |
||
01/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1927. Dep: 05/11/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1739 (Diagram 15B) |
||
12/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1929. Dep: 02/11/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1792 (Diagram 15B) |
||
31/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1931. Dep: 21/02/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 13 (Diagram 15B) |
||
16/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1933. Dep: 16/09/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1736 (Diagram 15B) |
||
23/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1936. Dep: 13/06/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1 (Diagram 15B) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
08/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1938. Dep: 05/11/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 64 (Diagram 15B) |
||
14/07/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1941. Dep: 26/07/1941. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/6 Boiler number 3325 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1943. Dep: 18/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1023 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
30/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) | ||
26/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3912 | ||
14/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1946. Dep: 12/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3274 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
19/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1949. Dep: 05/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3413 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63912 |
||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
07/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1951. Dep: 21/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22178 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/04/1951. Dep: 27/04/1951. | ||
04/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
17/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
29/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/11/1952. Dep: 10/01/1953. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
01/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1953. Dep: 15/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22137 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/08/1953. Dep: 25/08/1953. | ||
18/07/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
09/01/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
25/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1956. Dep: 24/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22893 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
09/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1959. Dep: 06/06/1959. Work undertaken: Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
||
09/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63912 from Langwith Junction (41J) |