|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 29/01/1921 | 09/04/1921 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/05/1923 | 13/07/1923 | 70 days | General | Boiler number 5 (Diagram 15B) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/09/1924 | 21/11/1924 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 1737 (Diagram 15B) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5011 |
||
Gorton Works | 19/08/1927 | 15/10/1927 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 1726 (Diagram 15B) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/01/1929 | 12/03/1929 | 47 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/08/1931 | 09/10/1931 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 11 (Diagram 15B) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/04/1933 | 29/07/1933 | 95 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1936 | 01/05/1936 | 41 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/6 Boiler number 1081 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
Gorton Works | 24/05/1938 | 16/07/1938 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/02/1941 | 15/03/1941 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 3245 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/09/1943 | 23/10/1943 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 1281 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/07/1945 | 06/10/1945 | 76 days | General | Boiler number 3404 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/12/1947 | 18/02/1948 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 3424 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3913 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/03/1948 | 03/03/1948 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 03/10/1950 | 28/10/1950 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 22122 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63913 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/11/1950 | 03/11/1950 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1953 | 12/09/1953 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 22178 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1956 | 29/12/1956 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 22233 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/06/1961 | 26/08/1961 | 68 days | General | Boiler number 22228 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/09/1961 | 09/09/1961 | 9 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1919 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 11 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15B boiler fitted |
||
15/11/1919 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
29/01/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/01/1921. Dep: 09/04/1921. | ||
05/05/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1923. Dep: 13/07/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5 (Diagram 15B) |
||
19/09/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1924. Dep: 21/11/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1737 (Diagram 15B) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5011 |
||
19/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1927. Dep: 15/10/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1726 (Diagram 15B) |
||
25/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1929. Dep: 12/03/1929. | ||
28/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1931. Dep: 09/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 11 (Diagram 15B) |
||
26/04/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1933. Dep: 29/07/1933. | ||
22/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1936. Dep: 01/05/1936. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/6 Boiler number 1081 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
07/06/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
24/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1938. Dep: 16/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 943 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/06/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
27/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1941. Dep: 15/03/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3245 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/11/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
27/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1943. Dep: 23/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1281 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/07/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3404 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3913 | ||
22/12/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
31/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1947. Dep: 18/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3424 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3913 |
||
01/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/03/1948. Dep: 03/03/1948. | ||
22/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
28/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
21/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
27/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN) | ||
17/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Skipton (20F) | ||
03/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1950. Dep: 28/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22122 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63913 |
||
01/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/11/1950. Dep: 03/11/1950. | ||
20/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1953. Dep: 12/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22178 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1956. Dep: 29/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22233 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
20/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1961. Dep: 26/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22228 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/09/1961. Dep: 09/09/1961. | ||
11/02/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
06/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63913 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |