Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 55 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2981 Week
» 4719 Month
» 132162 Year
» 1797538 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 12 m/e 09/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5012   06/08/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3914   13/10/1946
British Railways 63914 w/e 02/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O509/1919
O4/6 (2-8-0)06/08/1926
O4/8 (2-8-0)30/07/1955
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 622
To Service During 09/1919
Withdrawal Thu 28/05/1964 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Service Life 44 yrs, 8 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Rigleys (Bulwell Forest)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Bulwell Forest Wagon Works, 8/64

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1919
MEX   Mexborough on 12/12/1919
RET   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 13/01/1946
     Withdrawn on 28/05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 28/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1919 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1791)
06/08/1926 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1944)
04/12/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1956)
27/10/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1867)
14/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1093)
14/08/1937 Intensifore lubricator removed
07/09/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3212)
05/09/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1190)
13/01/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3401)
25/01/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3266)
02/04/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3355)
24/03/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22168)
20/06/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22192)
30/07/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28881)
07/06/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28313)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 19/02/1921 18/07/1921 150 days General    
Gorton Works 12/05/1923 15/08/1923 96 days General    
Gorton Works 31/03/1926 06/08/1926 129 days General Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 1944 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5012
 
Gorton Works 22/06/1928 21/08/1928 61 days General    
Gorton Works 18/10/1930 04/12/1930 48 days General Boiler number 1956 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1934 27/10/1934 27 days General Boiler number 1867 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/07/1937 14/08/1937 19 days General Boiler number 1093 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1940 07/09/1940 15 days General Boiler number 3212 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/06/1942 05/09/1942 70 days General Boiler number 1190 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/12/1944 13/01/1945 35 days General Boiler number 3401 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/12/1946 25/01/1947 49 days General Boiler number 3266 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/03/1949 02/04/1949 31 days General Boiler number 3355 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63914
 
Gorton Works 15/02/1951 24/03/1951 38 days General Boiler number 22168 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/03/1951 24/04/1951 28 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 01/06/1953 20/06/1953 20 days General Boiler number 22192 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/06/1953 02/07/1953 10 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 18/05/1955 30/07/1955 74 days General Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28881 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1955 10/08/1955 2 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 08/05/1958 07/06/1958 31 days General Boiler number 28313 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 18/03/1961 22/04/1961 36 days Heavy Intermediate    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1919 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 12
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15B boiler fitted
   
12/12/1919 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
19/02/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1921. Dep: 18/07/1921.    
12/05/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1923. Dep: 15/08/1923.    
31/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1926. Dep: 06/08/1926.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 1944 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5012
   
22/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1928. Dep: 21/08/1928.    
18/10/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1930. Dep: 04/12/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1956 (Diagram 15)
   
01/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1934. Dep: 27/10/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1867 (Diagram 15)
   
27/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1937. Dep: 14/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1093 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
24/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1940. Dep: 07/09/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3212 (Diagram 15)
   
28/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1942. Dep: 05/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1190 (Diagram 15)
   
10/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1944. Dep: 13/01/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3401 (Diagram 15)
   
13/01/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
13/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3914    
08/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1946. Dep: 25/01/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3266 (Diagram 15)
   
03/03/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1949. Dep: 02/04/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3355 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63914
   
15/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1951. Dep: 24/03/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22168 (Diagram 15)
   
28/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/03/1951. Dep: 24/04/1951.    
01/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1953. Dep: 20/06/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22192 (Diagram 15)
   
23/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/06/1953. Dep: 02/07/1953.    
18/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1955. Dep: 30/07/1955.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28881 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/08/1955. Dep: 10/08/1955.    
08/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1958. Dep: 07/06/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28313 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/03/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/03/1961. Dep: 22/04/1961.    
28/05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63914 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev