|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 09/04/1921 | 28/05/1921 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/05/1923 | 25/08/1923 | 106 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/03/1925 | 14/11/1925 | 246 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5013 |
||
Gorton Works | 25/02/1928 | 07/04/1928 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/03/1929 | 06/04/1929 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1 (Diagram 15B) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/09/1931 | 03/10/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 58 (Diagram 15B) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1934 | 03/11/1934 | 22 days | General | Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
Gorton Works | 19/06/1937 | 26/06/1937 | 8 days | General | Heating apparatus removed Boiler number 1791 (Diagram 15B) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1940 | 01/06/1940 | 15 days | General | Rebuilt to class 04/6 Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/05/1943 | 12/06/1943 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3350 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/12/1945 | 12/01/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3313 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/04/1948 | 01/05/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3204 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63915 |
||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1950 | 04/03/1950 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1951 | 18/08/1951 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22208 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/08/1951 | 24/08/1951 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 29/08/1953 | 19/09/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22210 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/11/1953 | 07/11/1953 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 22/10/1955 | 07/01/1956 | 78 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28887 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/10/1958 | 22/11/1958 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28359 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1919 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 13 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15B boiler fitted |
||
17/01/1920 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
09/04/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1921. Dep: 28/05/1921. | ||
12/05/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1923. Dep: 25/08/1923. | ||
14/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1925. Dep: 14/11/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5013 |
||
25/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1928. Dep: 07/04/1928. | ||
16/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1929. Dep: 06/04/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1 (Diagram 15B) |
||
19/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1931. Dep: 03/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 58 (Diagram 15B) |
||
13/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1934. Dep: 03/11/1934. Work undertaken: Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
19/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1937. Dep: 26/06/1937. Work undertaken: Heating apparatus removed Boiler number 1791 (Diagram 15B) |
||
18/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1940. Dep: 01/06/1940. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class 04/6 Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1943. Dep: 12/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3350 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1945. Dep: 12/01/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3313 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
21/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3915 | ||
10/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1948. Dep: 01/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3204 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63915 |
||
18/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/02/1950. Dep: 04/03/1950. | ||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
31/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
04/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1951. Dep: 18/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22208 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/08/1951. Dep: 24/08/1951. | ||
17/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
06/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
29/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1953. Dep: 19/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22210 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
07/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/11/1953. Dep: 07/11/1953. | ||
22/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1955. Dep: 07/01/1956. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28887 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
25/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1958. Dep: 22/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28359 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/06/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63915 from Gorton (9G) |