|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 07/04/1923 | 09/06/1923 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 13 (Diagram 15B) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/05/1925 | 18/07/1925 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5014 |
||
Gorton Works | 19/05/1928 | 23/06/1928 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 873 (Diagram 15B) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/04/1930 | 31/05/1930 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/12/1932 | 21/01/1933 | 29 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/6 Boiler number 1187 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/10/1935 | 02/11/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1077 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1938 | 10/12/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1085 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1941 | 25/10/1941 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 3357 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 787 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1920 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 14 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15B boiler fitted |
||
11/02/1921 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
07/04/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1923. Dep: 09/06/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 13 (Diagram 15B) |
||
22/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
16/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1925. Dep: 18/07/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5014 |
||
19/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1928. Dep: 23/06/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 873 (Diagram 15B) |
||
19/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1930. Dep: 31/05/1930. | ||
24/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1932. Dep: 21/01/1933. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/6 Boiler number 1187 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/10/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1935. Dep: 02/11/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1077 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
26/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1938. Dep: 10/12/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1085 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1941. Dep: 25/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3357 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 787 |
||
25/10/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 787 from Mexborough (MEX) |