Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 408 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5395 Week
» 13510 Month
» 140953 Year
» 1806329 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 19 m/e 01/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5019   04/07/1925
War Dept. 721   14/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O501/1921
O4/6 (2-8-0)05/08/1933
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 622
To Service During 01/1921
Withdrawal Sun 14/09/1941 off Frodingham (FRO)
Service Life 20 yrs, 8 mths , 14 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Renumbered 721 and sent to the Middle East via Hull 23/9/41

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1921
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 18/03/1921
MEX   Mexborough on 03/03/1924
FRO   Frodingham on 23/08/1939
     Withdrawn on 14/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1921 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 11)
22/09/1928 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1736)
05/08/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1861)
25/07/1936 Intensifore lubricator removed
25/07/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3255)
13/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3435)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 07/04/1923 23/06/1923 78 days General    
Gorton Works 02/05/1925 04/07/1925 64 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5019
 
Gorton Works 18/08/1928 22/09/1928 36 days General Boiler number 1736 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1930 20/09/1930 43 days General    
Gorton Works 15/07/1933 05/08/1933 22 days General Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 1861 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/07/1936 25/07/1936 8 days General Boiler number 3255 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 13/05/1939 27/05/1939 15 days General    
Gorton Works 01/09/1941 13/09/1941 13 days General Boiler number 3435 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1921 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 19
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15B boiler fitted
   
18/03/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
07/04/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1923. Dep: 23/06/1923.    
03/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
02/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1925. Dep: 04/07/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5019
   
18/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1928. Dep: 22/09/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1736 (Diagram 15B)
   
09/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1930. Dep: 20/09/1930.    
15/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1933. Dep: 05/08/1933.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 1861 (Diagram 15)
   
18/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1936. Dep: 25/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3255 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
13/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1939. Dep: 27/05/1939.    
23/08/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
01/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3435 (Diagram 15)
   
14/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 721 from Frodingham (FRO)    
14/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 721    

prev prev