|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 07/04/1923 | 23/06/1923 | 78 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/05/1925 | 04/07/1925 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5019 |
||
Gorton Works | 18/08/1928 | 22/09/1928 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1736 (Diagram 15B) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/08/1930 | 20/09/1930 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 15/07/1933 | 05/08/1933 | 22 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/6 Boiler number 1861 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/07/1936 | 25/07/1936 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 3255 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
Gorton Works | 13/05/1939 | 27/05/1939 | 15 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 01/09/1941 | 13/09/1941 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 3435 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 19 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 15B boiler fitted |
||
18/03/1921 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
07/04/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1923. Dep: 23/06/1923. | ||
03/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
02/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1925. Dep: 04/07/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5019 |
||
18/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1928. Dep: 22/09/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1736 (Diagram 15B) |
||
09/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1930. Dep: 20/09/1930. | ||
15/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1933. Dep: 05/08/1933. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/6 Boiler number 1861 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1936. Dep: 25/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3255 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
13/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1939. Dep: 27/05/1939. | ||
23/08/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
01/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3435 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 721 from Frodingham (FRO) | ||
14/09/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 721 |