Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 51 Today
» 904 Yesterday
» 5582 Week
» 7320 Month
» 134763 Year
» 1800139 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 22 m/e 02/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5022   19/12/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3920   22/09/1946
British Railways 63920 w/e 23/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O502/1921
O4/6 (2-8-0)05/10/1935
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number 622
To Service During 02/1921
Withdrawal Wed 08/08/1962 off Wakefield (56A)
Service Life 41 yrs, 6 mths , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 10/62

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1921
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 15/04/1921
MEX   Mexborough on 22/03/1924
LNG   Langwith Junction on 09/06/1937
DON   Doncaster on 11/01/1939
GOR   Gorton on 03/02/1943
FRO   Frodingham on 06/12/1944
37A   Ardsley on 22/09/1952
37A   Ardsley 4w/e 04/10/1952
37C   Bradford Hammerton Street on 06/12/1953
56B   Ardsley on 05/01/1958
56A   Wakefield on 22/02/1959
     Withdrawn on 08/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 37C Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 4w/e 25/01/1958
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 21/03/1959
WDN   on 08/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1921 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 13)
21/04/1923 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1719)
18/08/1928 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1737)
10/12/1932 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 5)
05/10/1935 Intensifore lubricator removed
05/10/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1135)
08/01/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3229)
04/05/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3332)
13/06/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1323)
29/07/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 858)
23/11/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3278)
23/04/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3402)
15/09/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22215)
20/03/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22202)
29/12/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22133)
22/04/1961 Water Treatment apparatus fitted


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 17/03/1923 21/04/1923 36 days General Boiler number 1719 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 31/10/1925 19/12/1925 50 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5022
 
Gorton Works 28/07/1928 18/08/1928 22 days General Boiler number 1737 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1930 31/05/1930 50 days General    
Gorton Works 26/11/1932 10/12/1932 15 days General Boiler number 5 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1935 05/10/1935 22 days General Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 1135 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1937 08/01/1938 16 days General Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/04/1940 04/05/1940 15 days General Boiler number 3332 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/06/1942 13/06/1942 13 days General Boiler number 1323 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1944 29/07/1944 22 days General Boiler number 858 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/11/1946 23/11/1946 22 days General Boiler number 3278 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1949 23/04/1949 22 days General Boiler number 3402 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63920
 
Gorton Works 01/09/1951 15/09/1951 15 days General Boiler number 22215 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/09/1951 22/09/1951 5 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 27/02/1954 20/03/1954 22 days General Boiler number 22202 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/03/1954 26/03/1954 4 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 01/12/1956 29/12/1956 29 days General Boiler number 22133 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/03/1961 22/04/1961 36 days Heavy Intermediate Water Treatment apparatus fitted
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1921 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 22
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15B boiler fitted
   
15/04/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
17/03/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1923. Dep: 21/04/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1719 (Diagram 15B)
   
22/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
31/10/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1925. Dep: 19/12/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5022
   
28/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1928. Dep: 18/08/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1737 (Diagram 15B)
   
12/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1930. Dep: 31/05/1930.    
26/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1932. Dep: 10/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5 (Diagram 15B)
   
14/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1935. Dep: 05/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/6
Boiler number 1135 (Diagram 15)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
09/06/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
24/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1937. Dep: 08/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3229 (Diagram 15)
   
11/01/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
20/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1940. Dep: 04/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3332 (Diagram 15)
   
01/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1942. Dep: 13/06/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1323 (Diagram 15)
   
03/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
08/07/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1944. Dep: 29/07/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 858 (Diagram 15)
   
06/12/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
22/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3920    
02/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1946. Dep: 23/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3278 (Diagram 15)
   
02/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1949. Dep: 23/04/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3402 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63920
   
01/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1951. Dep: 15/09/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22215 (Diagram 15)
   
18/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/09/1951. Dep: 22/09/1951.    
22/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
06/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C)    
27/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1954. Dep: 20/03/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22202 (Diagram 15)
   
23/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/03/1954. Dep: 26/03/1954.    
01/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1956. Dep: 29/12/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22133 (Diagram 15)
   
05/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
22/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
18/03/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/03/1961. Dep: 22/04/1961.
Work undertaken:
Water Treatment apparatus fitted
   
08/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63920 from Wakefield (56A)    

prev