Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 133 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17936 Week
» 70952 Month
» 190479 Year
» 3217332 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1210 |
m/e |
04/1905 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8210 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5560 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
65560 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J17 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G58 |
To Service |
During 04/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 05/06/1962 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 2 mths , 5 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31C |
Kings Lynn |
4w/e |
16/04/1960 |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
01/10/1960 |
ALLOC |
31B |
March |
4w/e |
05/08/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/06/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1210 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8210 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5560 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65560 |
|
|
02/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) |
|
|
17/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
22/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
05/06/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65560 |
|
|