Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1918 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15324 Week
» 68340 Month
» 187867 Year
» 3214720 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
1217 |
m/e |
05/1905 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
8217 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
5567 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
65567 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
J17 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G58 |
To Service |
During 05/1905 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 06/08/1962 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys |
Information |
Vacuum Ejector and Steam Heat connector fitted in order to allow passenger work on the M&GN |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
Status Date |
17/09/2018 |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/08/1949 |
M. & G.N. R. Line |
On the Melton Constable-Cromer route the majority of trains are hauled by 'D.16' 4-4-0's, of which class eight examples were noted, apparently working out their time on far from onerous duties; while the heavier holiday trains at week-ends brought 'B.12' and 'B.17' 4-6-0's and 'K.2' and 'K.3' 2-6--0's. The ubiquitous 'B.1' class was in evidence, though usually on goods workings, and the same applies to the 'J.39' 0-6-0's. Ex-G.N, 0-6-0 No, 64249 ('J.6') and ex-G.E. 0-6-0's Nos. 5567 ('J.17') and 64653 ('J.19') were seen on passenger trains. Tank engines noted were Nos. 7664, 67677 an 67679 ('V.1') and No. 69679 ('N.7'), which were by no means hard pressed in handling two, three and four coach trains on this route, while occasionally an ex-G.E. 2-4-2T put in an appearance. Except for No. 61272 ('B.1') and No. 64249 ('J.6'), which were freshly painted in standard British Railways livery, the engines noted compared very unfavourably with those of earlier days in the matter of cleanliness. Most of the passenger trains were made up of corridor stock ranging from modern L.N.E. and L.M.S. vehicles to ex-E.C.J.S., G.E.. N.E. and N.B. coaches, with a considerable proportion of ex-L.N.W 'flat' roofed stock transferred to the M. & G.N. and now in former L.N.E. varnished teak livery. The average train set would get high marks for interest but little for uniformity. |
SLS/194910 |
10/03/1963 |
Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) |
Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. |
SLS/196304 |
11/05/1963 |
Worcester Works (Paint Shop) |
4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. |
SLS/196304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 1217 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8217 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5567 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Melton Constable (MC) |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 65567 |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
22/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) |
|
|
15/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
24/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
07/04/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
06/08/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 65567 |
|
|